Engel et al v. Piping Technology Company et al
Plaintiff: Katherine Elizabeth Engel and Mr. Danny Wayne Engel
Defendant: Piping Technology Company and Mr. Edgar D. Jaime
Case Number: 5:2020cv06097
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Piping Technology Company First Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs filed by Elizabeth A. Vasseur-Browne on behalf of Defendant Piping Technology Company.(Vasseur-Browne, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Elizabeth A. Vasseur-Browne on behalf of Defendants Edgar D. Jaime, Piping Technology Company.(Vasseur-Browne, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Lauren A. Horsman on behalf of Plaintiffs Danny Wayne Engel, Katherine Elizabeth Engel.(Horsman, Lauren)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of Mediator by Danny Wayne Engel, Katherine Elizabeth Engel. (Horsman, Lauren)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Danny Wayne Engel, Katherine Elizabeth Engel. (Horsman, Lauren)
July 8, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Elizabeth A. Vasseur-Browne on behalf of Defendant Piping Technology Company.(Vasseur-Browne, Elizabeth)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 8/6/2020.Proposed scheduling order due by 8/20/2020. Signed on July 7, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Elizabeth A. Vasseur-Browne on behalf of Defendant Piping Technology Company. (Vasseur-Browne, Elizabeth)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Elizabeth A. Vasseur-Browne on behalf of Defendant Edgar D. Jaime. (Vasseur-Browne, Elizabeth)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Circuit Court of Daviess County, Missouri County, case number 20DV-CC00016, filed by Elizabeth A. Vasseur-Browne on behalf of Piping Technology Company, Edgar D. Jaime. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6924426. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Vasseur-Browne, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2020: #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engel et al v. Piping Technology Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piping Technology Company
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Vasseur-Browne
Represented By: Paul Vincent Herbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Edgar D. Jaime
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Vasseur-Browne
Represented By: Paul Vincent Herbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Elizabeth Engel
Represented By: Robert Cowherd
Represented By: Lauren A. Horsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Danny Wayne Engel
Represented By: Robert Cowherd
Represented By: Lauren A. Horsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?