Osmon v. Saul
Plaintiff: Marjorie Lynn Osmon
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv06105
Filed: July 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint. United States Attorney General served on 7/30/2020. (Driskill, Roger)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint. Commissioner of Social Security, Office of the Regional Counsel served on 7/24/2020. (Driskill, Roger)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 7/24/2020 Social security answer due by 9/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 10/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Driskill, Roger)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by plaintiff, Marjorie Lynn Osmon and defendant, Andrew M. Saul. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Defendant)(Berner, Crystal)
July 21, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Woods, Gloria)
July 20, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 8/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
July 18, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Roger M. Driskill on behalf of Marjorie Lynn Osmon. (Filing fee $400 receipt number AMOWDC-6951971) Service due by 10/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Driskill, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osmon v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Lynn Osmon
Represented By: Roger M. Driskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?