Mathews v. Mainspring Management LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Mathews
Defendant: Mainspring Management LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv06118
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of settlement by Mainspring Management LLC (Holzhueter, Kersten)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER entered by Judge Howard F. Sachs. Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc 7) is granted. Mainspring Management LLC's answer is due 9/23/2020. Signed on 8/20/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Kersten Holzhueter on behalf of Mainspring Management LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Holzhueter, Kersten)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing Notice in State Court by Mainspring Management LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Holzhueter, Kersten)
August 19, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL PROCEDURES entered by Judge Howard F. Sachs. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/28/2020. Signed on 8/18/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kersten Holzhueter on behalf of Defendant Mainspring Management LLC.(Holzhueter, Kersten)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal by Mainspring Management LLC (Holzhueter, Kersten)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clinton County County, case number 20CN-CC00043, filed by Kersten Holzhueter on behalf of Mainspring Management LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6998361. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holzhueter, Kersten) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathews v. Mainspring Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mathews
Represented By: Jayson A. Watkins
Represented By: Charles Jason Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainspring Management LLC
Represented By: Kersten Holzhueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?