Noon et al v. City of Platte Woods, Missouri et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Noon, Christopher Skidmore and Candice Skidmore
Defendant: City of Platte Woods, Missouri, Chief of Police Jim Kerns and Mayor John Smedley
Interested Party: Robert Cutler
Case Number: 5:2020cv06124
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael Stipetich on behalf of Plaintiffs Thomas Noon, Candice Skidmore, Christopher Skidmore.(Stipetich, Michael)
October 16, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Christopher M Napolitano on behalf of Defendants City of Platte Woods, Missouri, Jim Kerns, John Smedley.(Napolitano, Christopher)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 motion for protective order. Signed on 10/13/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
October 13, 2020 Filing 18 RULES OF JURY TRIAL. Signed on 10/13/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/12/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 11:30 AM Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Jury Trial set for 10/25/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2021. Signed on 10/13/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Bough: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 10/13/2020. Scheduling Order to be entered. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Michael Stipetich. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Christopher Napolitano and Matthew Gist. Time in court: 2:55 p.m to 3:15 p.m. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Michael Stipetich on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/27/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stipetich, Michael)
October 6, 2020 Filing 14 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Rick Holtsclaw(Stipetich, Michael)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings as to Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint and Suggestions in Support filed by Matthew Justin Gist on behalf of City of Platte Woods, Missouri. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/20/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Gist, Matthew)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Thomas Noon, Candice Skidmore, Christopher Skidmore. (Stipetich, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 Before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Transfer and Consolidate. (Doc. #7). Defendants request this case be transferred and consolidated with an earlier-filed case, Cutler v. City of Platte Woods, Case No. 20-cv-06124, currently pending before Chief Judge Beth Phillips. Upon review of the parties' briefing, the applicable law, and the factual circumstances of both cases, the Court finds consolidation and transfer inappropriate given the minimal factual overlap. Accordingly, Defendants Motion to Transfer and Consolidate (Doc. #7) is DENIED. Signed on 9/9/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #7 MOTION to consolidate cases filed by Michael Stipetich on behalf of Plaintiffs Thomas Noon, Candice Skidmore, Christopher Skidmore. Reply suggestions due by 9/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Stipetich, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #7 MOTION to consolidate cases filed by Julie J. Gibson on behalf of interested party Robert Cutler. Reply suggestions due by 9/18/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Attorney Julie J. Gibson added to party Robert Cutler(pty:intp))(Gibson, Julie)
September 2, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/2/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 8/31/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to consolidate cases filed by Christopher M Napolitano on behalf of City of Platte Woods, Missouri, Jim Kerns, John Smedley. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/8/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Napolitano, Christopher)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Defendants' Joint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of City of Platte Woods, Missouri, Jim Kerns, John Smedley.(Napolitano, Christopher)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Bough for all further proceedings. District Judge Howard F. Sachs no longer assigned to case. Please note the new case number is 20-cv-06124-SRB. Signed on 8/21/20 by Clerk of Court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kern, Kendra)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed on 8/21/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Kern, Kendra)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL PROCEDURES entered by Judge Howard F. Sachs. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/28/2020. Signed on 8/19/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Platte County, Missouri County, case number 20AE-CC00195, filed by Christopher M Napolitano on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-7001323. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Napolitano, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noon et al v. City of Platte Woods, Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Noon
Represented By: Michael Stipetich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Skidmore
Represented By: Michael Stipetich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Skidmore
Represented By: Michael Stipetich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Platte Woods, Missouri
Represented By: Matthew Justin Gist
Represented By: Christopher M Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police Jim Kerns
Represented By: Matthew Justin Gist
Represented By: Christopher M Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor John Smedley
Represented By: Matthew Justin Gist
Represented By: Christopher M Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Robert Cutler
Represented By: Julie J. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?