Gardner v. Singh et al
Plaintiff: Vicky Gardner
Defendant: Sunrise Freight Systems, Inc. and Sukhdeep Singh
Case Number: 5:2020cv06159
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 12/22/20 as Document No. 14, Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format to christy_anderson@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Kern, Kendra)
December 23, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
December 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of filing Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Vicky Gardner (Turner, John)
December 22, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for discovery to Continue Through July, 2021 filed by John E. Turner on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/5/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Turner, John)
December 18, 2020 Filing 12 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Richard McLeod(Turner, John)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE to take deposition of Sukhdeep Singh filed by John E. Turner on behalf of Plaintiff Vicky Gardner.(Turner, John)
December 15, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by John E. Turner on behalf of Plaintiff Vicky Gardner.(Turner, John)
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Terese Drew Bokern on behalf of Defendant Sunrise Freight Systems, Inc..(Bokern, Terese)
November 18, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/16/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 12/2/2020. Scheduling Teleconference set for 1/6/2021 09:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 11/16/20 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Sukhdeep Singh, Sunrise Freight Systems, Inc..(Bokern, Terese)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sukhdeep Singh, Sunrise Freight Systems, Inc.. (Bokern, Terese)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing Demand for Jury Trial by Vicky Gardner (Turner, John)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Terese Drew Bokern on behalf of Sukhdeep Singh, Sunrise Freight Systems, Inc. (Bokern, Terese)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing of Notice to the Plaintiff by Sukhdeep Singh, Sunrise Freight Systems, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Bokern, Terese)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Buchanan County, Missouri at St. Joseph County, case number 20BU-CV02976, filed by Terese Drew Bokern on behalf of Sunrise Freight Systems, Inc., Sukhdeep Singh. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-7126555. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Criminal Cover Sheet)(Bokern, Terese)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Gardner
Represented By: Christopher P. Sweeny
Represented By: Marty W. Seaton
Represented By: Kevin D. Meyers
Represented By: John E. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Freight Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Terese Drew Bokern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sukhdeep Singh
Represented By: Terese Drew Bokern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?