SCI Lodging Group, LLC v. K & J Representatives, LLC
Plaintiff: SCI Lodging Group, LLC
Defendant: K & J Representatives, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv06010
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL ORDER, Signed on March 11, 2021 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. Jury Trial set for 2/22/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6E, Kansas City (LMC) before Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (**Please note the trial is set to last 3 days**). Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2022 01:30 PM Courtroom 6E, Kansas City (LMC) before Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts.Proposed Jury Instructions, Proposed Voir Dire, Proposed Exhibit List and Proposed Witness List are all due by 1/24/2022. (Chorny, Traci)
March 9, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Danielle Marie Uzelac on behalf of Defendant K & J Representatives, LLC.(Uzelac, Danielle)
March 9, 2021 Filing 13 DESIGNATION of Mediator & Mediation by K & J Representatives, LLC filed by Danielle Marie Uzelac on behalf of Defendant K & J Representatives, LLC.(Uzelac, Danielle)
March 4, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by K & J Representatives, LLC. (Uzelac, Danielle)
February 24, 2021 Filing 11 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by SCI Lodging Group, LLC. (Hill, Michael)
February 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Magistrate Judge Assignment Returned by K & J Representatives, LLC, SCI Lodging Group, LLC. Jurisdiction by magistrate judge accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Melvin, Greg)
February 10, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Michael Hill on behalf of Plaintiff SCI Lodging Group, LLC.(Hill, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Michael Hill on behalf of SCI Lodging Group, LLC (Attorney Michael Hill added to party SCI Lodging Group, LLC (pty:pla))(Hill, Michael)
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of K & J Representatives, LLC.(Uzelac, Danielle)
January 27, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due on or before 3/15/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 3/1/2021. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Notice of Pretrial Procedures. The Clerk's Office is directed to forward the Rule 16 notice to Plaintiff's counsel via US Mail to Mark G. McMahon, McMahon Hill LLC, 7730 Carondelet Avenue, Suite 147, Clayton, MO 63105. Signed on January 21, 2021 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica) Modified on 1/21/2021 to reflect a copy of the Rule 16 Notice was mailed on today's date to Plaintiff's counsel as directed. (Woods, Gloria).
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) Modified on 1/21/2021 to reflect the MAP Notice and General Order were mailed to Plaintiff's Counsel on today's date to Mark G. McMahon, McMahon Hill LLC, 7730 Carondelet Avenue, Suite 147, Clayton, MO 63105 (Woods, Gloria).
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Danielle Marie Uzelac on behalf of K & J REPRESENTATIVES, LLC (Attorney Danielle Marie Uzelac added to party K & J REPRESENTATIVES, LLC(pty:dft))(Uzelac, Danielle)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Derek G. Johannsen on behalf of Defendant K & J REPRESENTATIVES, LLC.(Johannsen, Derek)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Derek G. Johannsen on behalf of K & J REPRESENTATIVES, LLC (Johannsen, Derek)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Buchanan County County, case number 20BU-CV04264, K & J REPRESENTATIVES, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMOWDC-7242149. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Johannsen, Derek) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2021: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).
January 20, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to defendant: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 2/10/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria) Modified on 1/21/2021 to reflect a paper copy of the Magistrate Assignment was mailed on today's date to Plaintiff's counsel at the following address: Mark G. McMahon, McMahon Hill LLC, 7730 Carondelet Avenue, Suite 147, Clayton, MO 63105(Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCI Lodging Group, LLC v. K & J Representatives, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCI Lodging Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K & J Representatives, LLC
Represented By: Danielle Marie Uzelac
Represented By: Derek G. Johannsen
Represented By: John G. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?