Decker v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Decker
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2021cv06025
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Referring Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. The parties' joint motion for a stay to permit them to attempt to effect a global settlement is GRANTED in part. The Court will stay the case until June 2, 2021. If the Court is not notified prior to June 2, 2021 that the settlement is final, the Court will enter a scheduling order on that date giving the parties six months to complete discovery and setting the trial date for summer 2022. No further stays will be granted. Signed on March 26, 2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Opalach, Tessa)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 03/25/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. In light of the fact that other counsel continue to represent Defendants, Richard B. North is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants, (Doc. #7 ). Signed on 03/25/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Lock, Tania)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. With consent of the Honorable Nanette K. Laughrey, this case is reassigned to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey for all further proceedings. District Judge Roseann Ketchmark no longer assigned to case. Signed on March 25, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
March 10, 2021 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Stubbs, Kara)
March 5, 2021 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to stay Proceedings and Supporting Memorandum filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/19/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 This document has been deleted. ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey.Proposed scheduling order due by 3/26/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 3/19/2021. Signed on 03/05/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) Modified on 3/5/2021 (Lock, Tania).
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 This document has been deleted. ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 03/05/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) Modified on 3/5/2021 (Lock, Tania).
March 5, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the documents filed on 03/05/2021 as Document Nos. 13 & 14, Order On Pretrial Procedures & Order Setting Deadlines for Proposed Scheduling Order. The documents have been deleted as they were filed in error. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Lock, Tania)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Steven Scott Schulte for Barbara Decker allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to allow Steven S. Schulte to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7315159) filed by Chelsea E Dickerson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Dickerson, Chelsea)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Chelsea E Dickerson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Chelsea E Dickerson added to party Barbara Decker(pty:pla))(Dickerson, Chelsea)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Enjolique A Lett for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 Motion to allow Enjolique A. Lett to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7312490) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to withdraw as attorney for Richard B. North, Jr. filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Stubbs, Kara)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-04119. (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2021: #2 MDL 2641 Certified Docket Sheet) (Jones, Robin).
February 24, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/25/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/25/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 2/25/2021.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-04119-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 2/25/2021.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16213803 filed by Barbara Decker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 2/25/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Decker v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: Enjolique A Lett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: Enjolique A Lett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Decker
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Chelsea E Dickerson
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?