Mankin v. Northwest Health Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rebecca Mankin
Defendant: Northwest Health Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv06103
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of Plaintiff Rebecca Mankin.(Murphy, R.)
October 29, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Laura B. Brown on behalf of Defendant Northwest Health Services, Inc..(Brown, Laura)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 5/27/2022. Discovery due by 6/27/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 7/27/2022. Signed on 10/27/21 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
October 26, 2021 Filing 15 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Northwest Health Services, Inc.. (Brown, Laura)
October 25, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #8 MOTION to remand filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of Plaintiff Rebecca Mankin. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Murphy, R.)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 SUGGESTIONS in support re #12 MOTION to amend/correct Complaint filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of Plaintiff Rebecca Mankin. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Murphy, R.)
October 25, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to amend/correct Complaint filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of Rebecca Mankin. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/8/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Murphy, R.)
October 11, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Northwest Health Services Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by James Rodney Holland, II on behalf of Defendant Northwest Health Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Holland, James)
October 11, 2021 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #8 MOTION to remand filed by James Rodney Holland, II on behalf of Defendant Northwest Health Services, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 10/25/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Holland, James)
September 27, 2021 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Northwest Health Services Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of Plaintiff Rebecca Mankin. Reply suggestions due by 10/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Murphy, R.)
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to remand filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of Rebecca Mankin. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiff's Suggestions in Support of Motion to Remand)(Murphy, R.)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 Partial ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Northwest Health Services, Inc..(Holland, James)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Northwest Health Services Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Laura B. Brown on behalf of Defendant Northwest Health Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Brown, Laura)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Northwest Health Services Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Laura B. Brown on behalf of Northwest Health Services, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/27/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Brown, Laura)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Laura B. Brown on behalf of Defendant Northwest Health Services, Inc..(Brown, Laura)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/26/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 10/12/2021. Signed on 9/9/21 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Buchanan County County, case number 21BU-CC00972, filed by James Rodney Holland, II. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7575462. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Buchanan County Circuit Court File, #2 Exhibit B -- Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holland, James) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/9/2021) (Houston, Kiambu).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mankin v. Northwest Health Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Mankin
Represented By: R. Edward Murphy
Represented By: Kyle Edward Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: James Rodney Holland, II
Represented By: Laura B. Brown
Represented By: Lydia M Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?