Collier v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Lance Arnold Collier
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2021cv06140
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Referring Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 11/5/2021 Social security answer due by 1/4/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 2/3/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sciolaro, Kyle)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. Please note the new case number: 21-6140-CV-SJ-FJG. (Melvin, Greg)
November 17, 2021 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 11/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
October 28, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Woods, Gloria)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Roger M. Driskill on behalf of Lance Arnold Collier. (Filing fee $402 receipt number AMOWDC-7644020) Service due by 1/24/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Driskill, Roger)
October 26, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: Plaintiff must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 11/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collier v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Arnold Collier
Represented By: Roger M. Driskill
Represented By: Andrea McGrath Wehner
Represented By: Kyle Henry Sciolaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?