Plaintiff A et al v Park Hill School District et al
Plaintiff: Plaintiff A, Plaintiff B, Plaintiff C and Plaintiff D
Defendant: Park Hill School District, Janice Bolin, Bart Klein, Kimberley Ried, Todd Fane, Scott Monsees, Susan Newburger, Brandy Woodley, Jeanette Cowherd, Josh Colvin and Kerrie Herren
Case Number: 5:2021cv06153
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2022 Filing 55 PROPOSED WITNESS LIST by Plaintiff A, Plaintiff B, Plaintiff C, Plaintiff D Plaintiffs' Preliminary Witness List. (Lansford, Jamie)
January 4, 2022 Filing 54 Amended NOTICE to take deposition of Park Hill School District filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of Plaintiffs Plaintiff A, Plaintiff B, Plaintiff C, Plaintiff D.(Lansford, Jamie)
January 4, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE to take deposition of Park Hill School District filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of Plaintiffs Plaintiff A, Plaintiff B, Plaintiff C, Plaintiff D.(Lansford, Jamie)
January 4, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE to take deposition of Dr. Jeanette Cowherd filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of Plaintiffs Plaintiff A, Plaintiff B, Plaintiff C, Plaintiff D.(Lansford, Jamie)
January 4, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE to take deposition of Dr. Kerrie Herren filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of Plaintiffs Plaintiff A, Plaintiff B, Plaintiff C, Plaintiff D.(Lansford, Jamie)
January 4, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE to take deposition of Melvin Walker filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of Plaintiffs Plaintiff A, Plaintiff B, Plaintiff C, Plaintiff D.(Lansford, Jamie)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/7/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 1/3/2022 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
December 30, 2021 Filing 48 PROPOSED WITNESS LIST by Janice Bolin, Josh Colvin, Jeanette Cowherd, Todd Fane, Kerrie Herren, Bart Klein, Scott Monsees, Susan Newburger, Park Hill School District, Kimberley Ried, Brandy Woodley for Preliminary Injunction Hearing. (Hatley, W.)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Before the Court is Motion for the Use of Initials to Identify Minor Witnesses. (Doc. #46.) Upon review, the motion is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that (1) any minor testifying as a witness at the preliminary injunction hearing is to be referred to and identify themselves by their initials; and (2) counsel shall disclose the names of such minor witnesses to their clients and co-counsel, but to their clients and co-counsel only. Signed on 12/29/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
December 29, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION for order Order Requiring Use of Initials to Identify Minor Witnesses filed by W. Joseph Hatley on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/12/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hatley, W.)
December 23, 2021 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janice Bolin, Josh Colvin, Jeanette Cowherd, Todd Fane, Kerrie Herren, Bart Klein, Scott Monsees, Susan Newburger, Park Hill School District, Kimberley Ried, Brandy Woodley filed by Stephanie Lovett-Bowman on behalf of Defendants Janice Bolin, Josh Colvin, Jeanette Cowherd, Todd Fane, Kerrie Herren, Bart Klein, Scott Monsees, Susan Newburger, Park Hill School District, Kimberley Ried, Brandy Woodley.(Lovett-Bowman, Stephanie)
December 23, 2021 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janice Bolin, Josh Colvin, Jeanette Cowherd, Todd Fane, Kerrie Herren, Bart Klein, Scott Monsees, Susan Newburger, Park Hill School District, Kimberley Ried, Brandy Woodley filed by Stephanie Lovett-Bowman on behalf of Defendants Janice Bolin, Josh Colvin, Jeanette Cowherd, Todd Fane, Kerrie Herren, Bart Klein, Scott Monsees, Susan Newburger, Park Hill School District, Kimberley Ried, Brandy Woodley.(Lovett-Bowman, Stephanie)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Before the Court is Motion to Modify Order Allowing Plaintiffs to Proceed Anonymously. (Doc. #36.) Upon review, the motion is DENIED. Signed on 12/22/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Houston, Kiambu)
December 16, 2021 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants of First Request for Production filed by W. Joseph Hatley on behalf of Defendants Janice Bolin, Josh Colvin, Jeanette Cowherd, Todd Fane, Kerrie Herren, Bart Klein, Scott Monsees, Susan Newburger, Park Hill School District, Kimberley Ried, Brandy Woodley.(Hatley, W.)
December 9, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Preliminary Injunction hearing set for 1/31/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
December 8, 2021 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Janice Bolin, Josh Colvin, Jeanette Cowherd, Todd Fane, Kerrie Herren, Bart Klein, Scott Monsees, Susan Newburger, Park Hill School District, Kimberley Ried, Brandy Woodley.(Hatley, W.)
December 6, 2021 Filing 39 Before the Court is Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Doc. #35.) For good cause stated, the motion is GRANTED. Defendants may file their answer on or before December 8, 2021. Signed on 12/6/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Houston, Kiambu)
December 6, 2021 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs of Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents and Things to All Defendants and First Interrogatories to All Defendants filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of Plaintiffs Plaintiff A, Plaintiff B, Plaintiff C, Plaintiff D.(Lansford, Jamie)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed on 12/6/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Houston, Kiambu)
December 6, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for reconsideration re 5 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by W. Joseph Hatley on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/20/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 5 ) (Hatley, W.)
December 6, 2021 Filing 35 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by W. Joseph Hatley on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/20/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Hatley, W.)
December 3, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of filing Report of the Parties as to Limited and Expedited Discovery and Briefing Schedule by Plaintiff A, Plaintiff B, Plaintiff C, Plaintiff D (Lansford, Jamie)
December 3, 2021 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by W. Joseph Hatley on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/17/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hatley, W.)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 On November 29, 2021, the Court presided over a hearing regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative for a Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #7). For the reasons stated on the record, the motion is DENIED. The parties are directed to meet and confer regarding a limited and expedited discovery and briefing schedule in anticipation of a forthcoming preliminary injunction hearing. On or before December 3, 2021, the parties shall inform the Court of its proposed deadlines, at which point the Court will schedule the preliminary injunction hearing. Signed on 11/29/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
November 29, 2021 Filing 31 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Bough: ORAL ARGUMENT on plaintiffs' pending motion for TRO (Doc. #7) held on 11/29/2021. Court orally denies the TRO motion. Time in court: 3:00 p.m. to 4:18 p.m.. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Gayle Wambolt, 816-512-5641, gayle_wambolt@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
November 28, 2021 Filing 30 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #7 MOTION for temporary restraining order or in the alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of Plaintiffs Plaintiff A, Plaintiff B, Plaintiff C, Plaintiff D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 6, Declaration of Plaintiff B's Mother, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 7, Declaration of Plaintiff A's Mother, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 8, Declaration of Dr. Nicole Price)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Lansford, Jamie)
November 23, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of appearance by Olawale O Akinmoladun on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Olawale O Akinmoladun added to party Janice Bolin(pty:dft), Attorney Olawale O Akinmoladun added to party Josh Colvin(pty:dft), Attorney Olawale O Akinmoladun added to party Jeanette Cowherd(pty:dft), Attorney Olawale O Akinmoladun added to party Todd Fane(pty:dft), Attorney Olawale O Akinmoladun added to party Kerrie Herren(pty:dft), Attorney Olawale O Akinmoladun added to party Bart Klein(pty:dft), Attorney Olawale O Akinmoladun added to party Scott Monsees(pty:dft), Attorney Olawale O Akinmoladun added to party Susan Newburger(pty:dft), Attorney Olawale O Akinmoladun added to party Park Hill School District(pty:dft), Attorney Olawale O Akinmoladun added to party Kimberley Ried(pty:dft), Attorney Olawale O Akinmoladun added to party Brandy Woodley(pty:dft))(Akinmoladun, Olawale)
November 23, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of appearance by Stephanie Lovett-Bowman on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Stephanie Lovett-Bowman added to party Janice Bolin(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Lovett-Bowman added to party Josh Colvin(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Lovett-Bowman added to party Jeanette Cowherd(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Lovett-Bowman added to party Todd Fane(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Lovett-Bowman added to party Kerrie Herren(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Lovett-Bowman added to party Bart Klein(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Lovett-Bowman added to party Scott Monsees(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Lovett-Bowman added to party Susan Newburger(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Lovett-Bowman added to party Park Hill School District(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Lovett-Bowman added to party Kimberley Ried(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Lovett-Bowman added to party Brandy Woodley(pty:dft))(Lovett-Bowman, Stephanie)
November 22, 2021 Filing 27 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #7 MOTION for temporary restraining order or in the alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction filed by W. Joseph Hatley on behalf of Defendants Janice Bolin, Josh Colvin, Jeanette Cowherd, Todd Fane, Kerrie Herren, Bart Klein, Scott Monsees, Susan Newburger, Park Hill School District, Kimberley Ried, Brandy Woodley. Reply suggestions due by 12/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff A Student Registration Information, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Dr. Kerrie Herren Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-1 - Student Email to Dr. Herren 9-16-21 5:44pm, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B-2 - Student Email to Dr. Herren 9-16-21 10:01 pm, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B-3 - Parent Email to Dr. Herren 9-17-21 7:42 am, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B-4 - Plaintiff A Statement, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B-5 - Plaintiff B Statement, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B-6 - Plaintiff C Statement, #9 Exhibit Exhibit B-7 - Plaintiff D Statement, #10 Exhibit Exhibit B-8 - Tweet of Petition, #11 Exhibit Exhibit B-9 - Teacher Email to Dr. Herren 9-17-21 1:39 pm, #12 Exhibit Exhibit B-10 - Dr. Herren Email to Park Hill South Community 9-17-21 5:49 pm, #13 Exhibit Exhibit B-11 - Kerrie Herren Timeline, #14 Exhibit Exhibit C - Change.org Petition, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D - Dr. Joshua Colvin Declaration, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D-1 - Player 1 Statement, #17 Exhibit Exhibit D-2 - Player 2 Statement, #18 Exhibit Exhibit D-3 - Player 3 Statement, #19 Exhibit Exhibit D-4 - Plaintiff B Statement re Threat to PHS, #20 Exhibit Exhibit E - Dr. Terri Deayon Declaration, #21 Exhibit Exhibit F - Dr. Jeanette Cowherd Declaration, #22 Exhibit Exhibit G - Park Hill School District Policy JG)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Hatley, W.)
November 19, 2021 Filing 26 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Bough: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 11/19/2021. Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #7) is set for 11/29/2021 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Arthur Benson and Jamie Lansford. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Joseph Hatley. Time in court: 3:30 p.m. to 3:45 p.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Gayle Wambolt, 816-512-5641, gayle_wambolt@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
November 17, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of appearance by W. Joseph Hatley on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney W. Joseph Hatley added to party Janice Bolin(pty:dft), Attorney W. Joseph Hatley added to party Josh Colvin(pty:dft), Attorney W. Joseph Hatley added to party Jeanette Cowherd(pty:dft), Attorney W. Joseph Hatley added to party Todd Fane(pty:dft), Attorney W. Joseph Hatley added to party Kerrie Herren(pty:dft), Attorney W. Joseph Hatley added to party Bart Klein(pty:dft), Attorney W. Joseph Hatley added to party Scott Monsees(pty:dft), Attorney W. Joseph Hatley added to party Susan Newburger(pty:dft), Attorney W. Joseph Hatley added to party Park Hill School District(pty:dft), Attorney W. Joseph Hatley added to party Kimberley Ried(pty:dft), Attorney W. Joseph Hatley added to party Brandy Woodley(pty:dft))(Hatley, W.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. A Telephone Conference to set a date and time for a hearing on the pending motion for a temporary restraining order (Doc. #7) is set for 11/19/2021 at 3:30 PM before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
November 16, 2021 Filing 23 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Brandy Woodley served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Lansford, Jamie)
November 16, 2021 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Kimberley Ried served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Lansford, Jamie)
November 16, 2021 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Susan Newburger served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Lansford, Jamie)
November 16, 2021 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Scott Monsees served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Lansford, Jamie)
November 16, 2021 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Bart Klein served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Lansford, Jamie)
November 16, 2021 Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Kerrie Herren served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Lansford, Jamie)
November 16, 2021 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Todd Fane served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Lansford, Jamie)
November 16, 2021 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Jeanette Cowherd served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Lansford, Jamie)
November 16, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Josh Colvin served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Lansford, Jamie)
November 16, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Janice Bolin served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Lansford, Jamie)
November 16, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Park Hill School District served on 11/15/2021. (Lansford, Jamie)
November 16, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of filing Final Notice as to Service by Plaintiff A, Plaintiff B, Plaintiff C, Plaintiff D (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Screenshot of Proof of Service on PHSD)(Lansford, Jamie)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing Update as to Service by Plaintiff A, Plaintiff B, Plaintiff C, Plaintiff D (Lansford, Jamie)
November 15, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria)
November 13, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of filing Notice as to Service by Plaintiff A, Plaintiff B, Plaintiff C, Plaintiff D (Lansford, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plaintiff A et al v Park Hill School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiff A
Represented By: Arthur A. Benson
Represented By: Jamie Kathryn Lansford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiff B
Represented By: Arthur A. Benson
Represented By: Jamie Kathryn Lansford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiff C
Represented By: Arthur A. Benson
Represented By: Jamie Kathryn Lansford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiff D
Represented By: Jamie Kathryn Lansford
Represented By: Arthur A. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Hill School District
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Represented By: Olawale O Akinmoladun
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Bolin
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Represented By: Olawale O Akinmoladun
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bart Klein
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Represented By: Olawale O Akinmoladun
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberley Ried
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Represented By: Olawale O Akinmoladun
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Fane
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Represented By: Olawale O Akinmoladun
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Monsees
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Represented By: Olawale O Akinmoladun
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Newburger
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Represented By: Olawale O Akinmoladun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy Woodley
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Represented By: Olawale O Akinmoladun
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette Cowherd
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Represented By: Olawale O Akinmoladun
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Colvin
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Represented By: Olawale O Akinmoladun
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerrie Herren
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Represented By: Olawale O Akinmoladun
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?