Anderson v. St. Joseph School District No. 231
Plaintiff: Susan Anderson
Defendant: St. Joseph School District No. 231
Case Number: 5:2021cv06158
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Ryan S VanFleet on behalf of St. Joseph School District No. 231 (Attorney Ryan S VanFleet added to party St. Joseph School District No. 231(pty:dft))(VanFleet, Ryan)
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Jeffrey A. Marriott on behalf of St. Joseph School District No. 231 (Attorney Jeffrey A. Marriott added to party St. Joseph School District No. 231(pty:dft))(Marriott, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to St. Joseph School District No. 231. (Kern, Kendra)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against St. Joseph School District No. 231 filed by Mark V. Dugan on behalf of Susan Anderson. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7679475. Service due by 2/16/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, civil cover sheet)(Dugan, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. St. Joseph School District No. 231
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Anderson
Represented By: Mark V. Dugan
Represented By: Heather J. Schlozman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph School District No. 231
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Marriott
Represented By: Ryan S VanFleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?