Cosper v. Tjelle
Plaintiff: Cynthia Cosper
Defendant: Christian Tjelle
Case Number: 5:2022cv06090
Filed: August 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
September 29, 2022 Filing 16 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Rick Merker(Short, Meredith)
September 29, 2022 Filing 15 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Rick Merker(Short, Meredith)
September 28, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cynthia Cosper filed by David C. DeGreeff on behalf of Plaintiff Cynthia Cosper.(DeGreeff, David)
September 22, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Meredith Jane Short on behalf of Defendant Christian Tjelle.(Short, Meredith)
September 22, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to file First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Petition filed by Meredith Jane Short on behalf of Christian Tjelle. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/6/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - First Amended Answer)(Short, Meredith)
September 21, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Rick Merker(DeGreeff, David) Modified on 9/22/2022(Crocker, Susan).
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/15/2023. Pretrial Conference via telephone set for 10/5/2023 01:30 PM before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Jury Trial set for 11/7/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8A, Kansas City (GAF) before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Dispositive Motions due by 6/2/2023. Signed on 9/21/22 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
September 21, 2022 Filing 9 RULES OF TRIAL Signed on 9/21/22 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
September 21, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
September 20, 2022 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Jury Trial Order by Christian Tjelle. (Short, Meredith)
September 20, 2022 Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Rick Merker(Short, Meredith)
August 17, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/26/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 9/16/2022. Signed on 8/12/22 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
August 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Michael E. McCausland on behalf of Christian Tjelle (McCausland, Michael)
August 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 11, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice to Plaintiff of Removal by Christian Tjelle (Short, Meredith)
August 11, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Meredith Jane Short on behalf of Christian Tjelle (Short, Meredith)
August 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Daviess County, case number 22DV-CC00023, Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8056950. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition, #2 Exhibit State Court Filings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Short, Meredith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cosper v. Tjelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Cosper
Represented By: David C. DeGreeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Tjelle
Represented By: Meredith Jane Short
Represented By: Michael E. McCausland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?