Herring-Dancy v. Milhaus Development LLC
Plaintiff: Andre Herring-Dancy
Defendant: Milhaus Development LLC
Case Number: 5:2023cv06010
Filed: January 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - This case has been reported as settled. In order to monitor it's docket, the Court orders the parties to file either a Stipulation of Dismissal or a Joint Status Report on or before April 3, 2023. Signed on 3/3/23 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - GRANTING #7 defendant's second unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. New Deadline: Answer due on or before 3/3/2023. Signed on 2/7/23 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy) Modified on 2/7/2023 to extend deadline at request of chambers (Anderson, Christy).
February 6, 2023 Filing 7 Second MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Samantha Jane Monsees on behalf of Milhaus Development LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/21/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Monsees, Samantha)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - GRANTING #5 defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. New Deadline: Answer due on or before 2/8/2023. Signed on 2/1/23 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
February 1, 2023 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Samantha Jane Monsees on behalf of Milhaus Development LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/15/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Monsees, Samantha)
January 25, 2023 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Samantha Jane Monsees on behalf of Defendant Milhaus Development LLC.(Monsees, Samantha)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 2/27/2023. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/13/2023. Signed on 1/25/23 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Anderson, Christy)
January 25, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 25, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clinton County, case number 22CN-CC00071, filed by Samantha Jane Monsees. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8294606. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Clinton County Court File, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of David Bullington, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Monsees, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herring-Dancy v. Milhaus Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Herring-Dancy
Represented By: Charles Jason Brown
Represented By: Jayson A. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milhaus Development LLC
Represented By: Samantha Jane Monsees
Represented By: Lauren M. Sobaski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?