Dixon v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Jamaal Dixon
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 5:2025cv06038
Filed: February 26, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of Dismissal. Signed on 4/17/25 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 17, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Jamaal Dixon (Brown, Charles)
March 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the parties to file their JOINT stipulation of dismissal or status report re #4 Notice of Settlement filed by Jamaal Dixon by 5/13/2025. Signed on 3/14/25 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
March 14, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of settlement by Jamaal Dixon (Brown, Charles)
February 28, 2025 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
February 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/13/2025. Rule 26 conference due by 4/3/2025. Signed on 2/27/25 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
February 26, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
February 26, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Buchanan County County, case number 25BU-CC00124, filed by Jordan Kurdi. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9455211. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Service Documents, #2 Exhibit B -- State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kurdi, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamaal Dixon
Represented By: Charles Jason Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Kurdi
Represented By: Shelley Irene Ericsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?