Consumers Insurance Company v. James River Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Consumers Insurance Company
Defendant: Houston Casualty Company, James River Insurance Company and U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2012cv03303
Filed: June 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Springfield Office
County: Andrew
Presiding Judge: John T. Maughmer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 67 motion for summary judgment in favor of U.S. Specialty Insurance Company and Houston Casualty Company. Signed on 1/14/14 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Alexander, Pam)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Order of dismissal with prejudice of all claims against Defenant James River Insurance Company. Signed on 12/18/13 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Alexander, Pam)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER finding as moot 49 motion for summary judgment; granting 62 motion for extension of time to October 11, 2013 to file Amended Motion For Summary Judgment. Signed on 9/30/13 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Alexander, Pam)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 11 motion to dismiss case; denying 14 motion to dismiss case. Signed on 10/19/12 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Alexander, Pam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consumers Insurance Company v. James River Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consumers Insurance Company
Represented By: Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?