Peters v. Department of the Army
Plaintiff: Gwen Peters
Defendant: Department of the Army
Case Number: 6:2015cv03017
Filed: January 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Springfield Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 68 Plaintiff's Motion to Modify the Court Order of July 18,2016. Signed on 9/15/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 63 motion for approval of settlement. Signed on 7/18/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 38 Defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed on 1/26/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. Department of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Peters
Represented By: Alvin A Wolff, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?