USA v. Little
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Gavin Little
Case Number: 6:2015cv03141
Filed: April 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Springfield Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: M. Douglas Harpool
Presiding Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:4246
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 81 motion and adopting 93 report and recommendation. Signed on 4/28/2021 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Maerz, Mary)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER adopting the 72 report and recommendation of the magistrate judge; granting plaintiff's 67 motion for conditional release. Defendant shall be conditionally released pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 4246(e). Signed on 8/29/2019 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Levin, Benjamin)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER adopting the report and recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; granting plaintiff's motion for revocation of conditional release. The defendant is COMMITTED to the custody of the attorney general for hospitalization and treatment in a suitable facility under 18 U.S.C § 4246(f). Signed on 3/28/2019 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Levin, Benjamin)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?