Blair v. Bowersox et al
Plaintiff: Diamond D Blair
Defendant: Michael Bowersox, Roger Terry, George Lombardi, Sabrina Bates and Paula Phillips-Reed
Case Number: 6:2015cv03532
Filed: December 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Springfield Office
County: Texas
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Presiding Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 190 Defendants' Trial Brief construed as a motion for partial judgment on the pleadings. The motion is is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs denial of due process claim against Defendant Roger Terry. In all other respects, the motion is DENIED. Signed on 1/31/2018 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Russell, Elizabeth)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER denying in part and granting in part Defendants' Motions to Dismiss ( 93 , 94 , 95 , 96 , and 97 ); Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 123 ; and Defendants' motion to seal document 25 . The Court permanently s eals Exhibits A, B, F, H, K, L, M, 1 & 2. The Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal Exhibit C [124-3], [124-4], and [124-5]. The following claims remain for trial: Count III against Roger Terry for failure to protect from attack; Count IV against Roger Terry for denial of due process; and Count VI against John Gerke for retaliatory discipline. Signed on 12/8/2017 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Russell, Elizabeth)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying 98 Motion to Vacate Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status. Signed on 5/26/2017 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (DO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. Bowersox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond D Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bowersox
Represented By: Audrey Leanne Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Terry
Represented By: Audrey Leanne Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Lombardi
Represented By: Audrey Leanne Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina Bates
Represented By: Audrey Leanne Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Phillips-Reed
Represented By: Audrey Leanne Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?