Morris v. Moon Ridge Foods, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Dawn Morris
Defendant: Moon Ridge Foods, LLC and Heritage Foods, LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv03219
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Springfield Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:1104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Dawn Morris. Moon Ridge Foods, LLC served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Rhodes, Randall)
August 23, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 8/20/2018 as Document No. 4, Motion for Leave to Appear. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel has been contacted and will file the correct document using the correct event. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants' Request for Additional Time to File their Answers and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Doc. #5). For good cause stated the motion is granted. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until and including September 20, 2018. Signed on 8/21/18 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Ellis, Lindsey)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Katherine Mary Flett on behalf of All Defendants (Flett, Katherine)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Katherine Mary Flett on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/4/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Flett, Katherine)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear filed by Katherine Mary Flett on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/4/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Katherine Mary Flett added to party Heritage Foods, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine Mary Flett added to party Moon Ridge Foods, LLC(pty:dft))(Flett, Katherine)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Dawn Morris. Heritage Foods, LLC served on 7/31/2018, answer due 8/21/2018. (Rhodes, Randall)
July 27, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Heritage Foods, LLC, Moon Ridge Foods, LLC filed by Randall L. Rhodes on behalf of Dawn Morris. Filing fee $400, receipt number MOWDC-5857027. Service due by 10/15/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rhodes, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Moon Ridge Foods, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moon Ridge Foods, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Mary Flett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Foods, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Mary Flett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Morris
Represented By: Randall L. Rhodes
Represented By: Christopher Lee Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?