King et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Sacco, Benjamin Fuliar, Mary Pounds, Cortez Puryear, Rita Cole, Frank Pimentel, Brenda Atutonu King, Rob Reaves, Jennifer Reaves, Bill Way, Dennis Tobin, Rita Leake, James Owens, Steve Cole, James Pounds, Mary Sacco, Loretta Nance, Cynthia Shannon, Thomas Kohlbeck, Robert Shannon, Merle Rudebusch, Valerie Mathews, Gail Bergschneider, Magaly Puryear, Roger Leake, Catalina Fuliar, Gay Hartfield, Brenda Way, Richard Nance, Ron Bergschneider, Arlene Rudebusch, Cheryl Owens and Christina Tobin
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. and Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv03319
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Referring Judge: John T Maughmer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. 1st Interrogatories and 1st Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs filed by Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Defendants Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc..(Sharp, Darren)
November 20, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents to Defendants filed by M. Scott Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiffs Gail Bergschneider, Ron Bergschneider, Rita Cole, Steve Cole, Benjamin Fuliar, Catalina Fuliar, Gay Hartfield, Brenda Atutonu King, Thomas Kohlbeck, Rita Leake, Roger Leake, Valerie Mathews, Loretta Nance, Richard Nance, Cheryl Owens, James Owens, Frank Pimentel, James Pounds, Mary Pounds, Cortez Puryear, Magaly Puryear, Jennifer Reaves, Rob Reaves, Arlene Rudebusch, Merle Rudebusch, Mary Sacco, Robert Sacco, Robert Shannon, Cynthia Shannon, Christina Tobin, Dennis Tobin, Bill Way, Brenda Way.(Montgomery, M.)
November 20, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Second Interrogatories to Defendants filed by M. Scott Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiffs Gail Bergschneider, Ron Bergschneider, Rita Cole, Steve Cole, Benjamin Fuliar, Catalina Fuliar, Gay Hartfield, Brenda Atutonu King, Thomas Kohlbeck, Rita Leake, Roger Leake, Valerie Mathews, Loretta Nance, Richard Nance, Cheryl Owens, James Owens, Frank Pimentel, James Pounds, Mary Pounds, Cortez Puryear, Magaly Puryear, Jennifer Reaves, Rob Reaves, Arlene Rudebusch, Merle Rudebusch, Mary Sacco, Robert Sacco, Robert Shannon, Cynthia Shannon, Christina Tobin, Dennis Tobin, Bill Way, Brenda Way.(Montgomery, M.)
November 16, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Case Management Conference reset for 12/17/2018 01:30 PM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Howard, Linda)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 motion to continue case management conference Signed on 11/16/18 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Howard, Linda)
November 9, 2018 Filing 22 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Gail Bergschneider, Ron Bergschneider, Rita Cole, Steve Cole, Benjamin Fuliar, Catalina Fuliar, Gay Hartfield, Brenda Atutonu King, Thomas Kohlbeck, Rita Leake, Roger Leake, Valerie Mathews, Loretta Nance, Richard Nance, Cheryl Owens, James Owens, Frank Pimentel, James Pounds, Mary Pounds, Cortez Puryear, Magaly Puryear, Jennifer Reaves, Rob Reaves, Arlene Rudebusch, Merle Rudebusch, Mary Sacco, Robert Sacco, Robert Shannon, Cynthia Shannon, Christina Tobin, Dennis Tobin, Bill Way, Brenda Way. (Montgomery, M.)
November 9, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to continue Case Management Hearing scheduled for November 27, 2018 filed by M. Scott Montgomery on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/23/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Montgomery, M.)
November 9, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #3 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Over Non-Missouri Claims filed by David Alois Jermann on behalf of Defendants Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Jermann, David)
November 7, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Case Management Conference set for 11/27/2018 09:30 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Howard, Linda)
October 31, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories to Defendants filed by M. Scott Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiffs Gail Bergschneider, Ron Bergschneider, Rita Cole, Steve Cole, Benjamin Fuliar, Catalina Fuliar, Gay Hartfield, Brenda Atutonu King, Thomas Kohlbeck, Rita Leake, Roger Leake, Valerie Mathews, Loretta Nance, Richard Nance, Cheryl Owens, James Owens, Frank Pimentel, James Pounds, Mary Pounds, Cortez Puryear, Magaly Puryear, Jennifer Reaves, Rob Reaves, Arlene Rudebusch, Merle Rudebusch, Mary Sacco, Robert Sacco, Robert Shannon, Cynthia Shannon, Christina Tobin, Dennis Tobin, Bill Way, Brenda Way.(Montgomery, M.)
October 31, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents to Defendants filed by M. Scott Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiffs Gail Bergschneider, Ron Bergschneider, Rita Cole, Steve Cole, Benjamin Fuliar, Catalina Fuliar, Gay Hartfield, Brenda Atutonu King, Thomas Kohlbeck, Rita Leake, Roger Leake, Valerie Mathews, Loretta Nance, Richard Nance, Cheryl Owens, James Owens, Frank Pimentel, James Pounds, Mary Pounds, Cortez Puryear, Magaly Puryear, Jennifer Reaves, Rob Reaves, Arlene Rudebusch, Merle Rudebusch, Mary Sacco, Robert Sacco, Robert Shannon, Cynthia Shannon, Christina Tobin, Dennis Tobin, Bill Way, Brenda Way.(Montgomery, M.)
October 29, 2018 Filing 16 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #3 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Over Non-Missouri Claims filed by M. Scott Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiffs Gail Bergschneider, Ron Bergschneider, Rita Cole, Steve Cole, Benjamin Fuliar, Catalina Fuliar, Gay Hartfield, Brenda Atutonu King, Thomas Kohlbeck, Rita Leake, Roger Leake, Valerie Mathews, Loretta Nance, Richard Nance, Cheryl Owens, James Owens, Frank Pimentel, James Pounds, Mary Pounds, Cortez Puryear, Magaly Puryear, Jennifer Reaves, Rob Reaves, Arlene Rudebusch, Merle Rudebusch, Mary Sacco, Robert Sacco, Robert Shannon, Cynthia Shannon, Christina Tobin, Dennis Tobin, Bill Way, Brenda Way. Reply suggestions due by 11/13/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Montgomery, M.)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 motion for extension of time to file response/reply to #3 Defendant's Motion to dismiss based on lack of personal jurisdiction over non-Missouri claims. Plaintiff's response/reply is due 10/29/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 10/22/2018 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levin, Benjamin)
October 22, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #5 MOTION to dismiss case For Failure to Comply with Rule 9(b) filed by David Alois Jermann on behalf of Defendants Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Jermann, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #9 MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint filed by David Alois Jermann on behalf of Defendants Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 11/5/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Jermann, David)
October 19, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #3 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Over Non-Missouri Claims filed by M. Scott Montgomery on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/2/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Montgomery, M.)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/3/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 11/16/2018. Signed on 10/17/18 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION to dismiss case For Failure to Comply with Rule 9(b) filed by M. Scott Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiffs Gail Bergschneider, Ron Bergschneider, Rita Cole, Steve Cole, Benjamin Fuliar, Catalina Fuliar, Gay Hartfield, Brenda Atutonu King, Thomas Kohlbeck, Rita Leake, Roger Leake, Valerie Mathews, Loretta Nance, Richard Nance, Cheryl Owens, James Owens, Frank Pimentel, James Pounds, Mary Pounds, Cortez Puryear, Magaly Puryear, Jennifer Reaves, Rob Reaves, Arlene Rudebusch, Merle Rudebusch, Mary Sacco, Robert Sacco, Robert Shannon, Cynthia Shannon, Christina Tobin, Dennis Tobin, Bill Way, Brenda Way. Reply suggestions due by 10/30/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Montgomery, M.)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint filed by M. Scott Montgomery on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/30/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Montgomery, M.)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer to District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. Please note the new case number: 18-3319-CV-S-MDH. (Melvin, Greg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by David Alois Jermann on behalf of Defendants Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc..(Jermann, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 MOTION to dismiss case For Failure to Comply with Rule 9(b) filed by David Alois Jermann on behalf of Defendants Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Jermann, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to dismiss case For Failure to Comply with Rule 9(b) filed by David Alois Jermann on behalf of Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/19/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Jermann, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Over Non-Missouri Claims filed by David Alois Jermann on behalf of Defendants Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Jermann, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Over Non-Missouri Claims filed by David Alois Jermann on behalf of Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/19/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Jermann, David)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
October 1, 2018 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to counsel for all Plaintiffs and Defendants. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 10/22/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Taney County, Missouri County, case number 1846-cc00155, filed by David Alois Jermann on behalf of Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5961689. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court File, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of John Monaweck, #4 Exhibit C - Vondavid v. Blue Springs)(Jermann, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sacco
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Fuliar
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Pounds
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cortez Puryear
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Cole
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Pimentel
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Atutonu King
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Reaves
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Reaves
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Way
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Tobin
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Leake
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Owens
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Cole
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pounds
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Sacco
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Nance
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Shannon
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Kohlbeck
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Shannon
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merle Rudebusch
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Mathews
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Bergschneider
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magaly Puryear
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Leake
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catalina Fuliar
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gay Hartfield
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Way
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Nance
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Bergschneider
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Rudebusch
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Owens
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Tobin
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: David Alois Jermann
Represented By: Darren K. Sharp
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Brunkhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: David Alois Jermann
Represented By: Darren K. Sharp
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Brunkhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?