Gaines Photography, LLC v. Babe Ruth League, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gaines Photography, LLC
Defendant: Babe Ruth League, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv03357
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John T Maughmer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gaines Photography, LLC. Babe Ruth League, Inc. served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (Shaffer, Arthur)
November 28, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Babe Ruth League, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
November 2, 2018 Corrected NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 11/23/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Corrected Notice sent reflecting correct Magistrate Judge assignment. (Keller, Jeanne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 ***Remark - Report on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. A copy has been mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave., S.E., Washington, DC 20559-6000. (Keller, Jeanne)
October 26, 2018 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 11/16/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Babe Ruth League, Inc. filed by Arthur K. Shaffer on behalf of Gaines Photography, LLC. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6008517. Service due by 1/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Copyright Registration)(Shaffer, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaines Photography, LLC v. Babe Ruth League, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babe Ruth League, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaines Photography, LLC
Represented By: Arthur K. Shaffer
Represented By: Scott Strohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?