Andrews v. Envoy Air Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Louise Andrews
Defendant: Michael Vespa and Envoy Air Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv03373
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/7/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Discovery due by 6/21/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2019. Initial Pretrial Telephone Conference set for 10/17/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers via telephone before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Final Pretrial Telephone Conference set for 11/14/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers via telephone before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Jury Trial set for 11/18/2019 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on 12/21/2018 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Phillips, Caleb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 18 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ron Mitchell(Nelsen, Leo)
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Leo W Nelsen on behalf of Defendants Envoy Air Inc., Michael Vespa.(Nelsen, Leo)
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 Consent PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Envoy Air Inc., Michael Vespa. (Nelsen, Leo)
December 13, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of filing of Consent by Michael Vespa re #1 Notice of Removal, (Nelsen, Leo)
December 13, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Michael Vespa.(Nelsen, Leo)
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Louise Andrews. Waiver sent to Michael Vespa on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Reichard, Randall)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by Leo W Nelsen on behalf of Michael Vespa (Attorney Leo W Nelsen added to party Michael Vespa(pty:dft))(Nelsen, Leo)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Louise Andrews filed by Randall J. Reichard on behalf of Plaintiff Louise Andrews.(Reichard, Randall)
November 12, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Envoy Air Inc..(Nelsen, Leo)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Paul Lee for Envoy Air Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing of Notice to State Court of Removal by Envoy Air Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit File-Stamped Copy of Notice to State Court of Removal)(Nelsen, Leo)
November 7, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing Proof of Filing Removal in State Court by Envoy Air Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Receipt and Acceptance of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Removal File-stamped in State Court)(Nelsen, Leo)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 Motion to allow Paul B. Lee to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6024657) filed by Leo W Nelsen on behalf of Envoy Air Inc.. (Nelsen, Leo)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/19/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 12/5/2018. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed on 11/6/2018 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney) Copy mailed to Plaintiff and Plaintiff's counsel. Modified on 11/6/2018 (Keller, Jeanne).
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice to State Court of Removal by Envoy Air Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Nelsen, Leo)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Corporate Disclosure Statement by Envoy Air Inc. (Nelsen, Leo)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Envoy Air Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6022749. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Articles of Organization - Jackson Skycap, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelsen, Leo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Envoy Air Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Vespa
Represented By: Leo W Nelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envoy Air Inc.
Represented By: Leo W Nelsen
Represented By: Paul Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Andrews
Represented By: Randall J. Reichard
Represented By: Nicholas Austin Fax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?