Casteel v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Judy Casteel
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 6:2019cv03052
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 2/15/2019 Social security answer due by 4/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 5/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served: Atty general 2/21/19; US Atty 2/15/19; Office of Regional Counsel 2/20/19)(Overton, Kathleen)
February 13, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED and emailed to plaintiff's counsel as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Siegert, Karen)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Judy Casteel. (Filing fee $400 receipt number IFP) filed byKathleen Overton on behalf of Judy Casteel. Service due by 5/13/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Overton, Kathleen)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on February 12, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Judy Casteel. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Attorney Kathleen Overton added to party Judy Casteel(pty:pla))(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casteel v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Casteel
Represented By: Kathleen Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?