Jackson, et al. v. Green Dot Corporation
Plaintiff: Curtis Jackson and Antoinette Chapman
Defendant: Green Dot Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv03059
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John T Maughmer
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER:Final Pretrial Teleconference set for 2/1/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Parties will be provided the conference call-in numbers via e-mail at a later date. Jury Trial set for 3/1/2021 through 3/5/2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 4/10/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
April 10, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING Teleconference held on 4/10/2019; scheduling order to issue. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Time in court: 11:03 a.m. to 11:15 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657. (Baldwin, Joella)
April 9, 2019 **AMENDED** NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference has been reset, as to time only, to 4/10/19 at 11:00 a.m., via phone. Parties have previously been provided the conference call-in numbers. (Richard, Tracey)
April 5, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Nathan Duncan on behalf of Plaintiffs Antoinette Chapman, Curtis Jackson.(Duncan, Nathan)
April 5, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael W Seitz on behalf of Defendant Green Dot Corporation.(Seitz, Michael)
April 4, 2019 Filing 20 **AMENDED** NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference has been reset from 4/12/19 to 4/10/19 at 10:30 a.m., via phone. Parties have been provided the conference call-in numbers this date. (Baldwin, Joella)
April 3, 2019 Filing 19 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Jury Trial Order by Antoinette Chapman, Curtis Jackson. (Duncan, Nathan)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 It is ORDERED Plaintiffs' motion for extension of time to respond to Defendant's pending motions (Doc. #17) is, with Defendant having no objection, GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall respond to the pending motions on or before April 25, 2019. Signed on 4/2/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Defendant's Pending Motions filed by Nathan Duncan on behalf of Antoinette Chapman, Curtis Jackson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Duncan, Nathan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT re #14 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, to compel Plaintiff Antoinette Chapman to Individual Arbitration (Second Declaration of Mike Keeslar) by Green Dot Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Seitz, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 SUGGESTIONS in support re #14 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, to compel Plaintiff Antoinette Chapman to Individual Arbitration filed by Michael W Seitz on behalf of Defendant Green Dot Corporation. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Seitz, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, to compel Plaintiff Antoinette Chapman to Individual Arbitration filed by Michael W Seitz on behalf of Green Dot Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Seitz, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT re #11 MOTION to compel Plaintiff Curtis Jackson to Individual Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings (First Declaration of Mike Keeslar) by Green Dot Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Seitz, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 SUGGESTIONS in support re #11 MOTION to compel Plaintiff Curtis Jackson to Individual Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by Michael W Seitz on behalf of Defendant Green Dot Corporation. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Seitz, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to compel Plaintiff Curtis Jackson to Individual Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by Michael W Seitz on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Seitz, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Antoinette Chapman, Curtis Jackson. (Duncan, Nathan)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/5/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 3/22/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 2/28/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 It is ORDERED Defendant's motion for extension of time to file a responsive pleading (Doc. #7) is, with Plaintiffs having no objection, GRANTED. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading on or before March 21, 2019. Signed on 2/19/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for extension of time to respond to complaint filed by Michael W Seitz on behalf of Green Dot Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Seitz, Michael)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer to District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Please note the new case number: 19-3059-CV-S-BCW. (Melvin, Greg)
February 12, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to counsel for plaintiffs and defendant. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 3/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Camber Jones on behalf of Green Dot Corporation (Attorney Camber Jones added to party Green Dot Corporation(pty:dft))(Jones, Camber)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Jason C. Smith on behalf of Green Dot Corporation (Attorney Jason C. Smith added to party Green Dot Corporation(pty:dft))(Smith, Jason)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Michael W Seitz on behalf of Defendant Green Dot Corporation.(Seitz, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Dallas County, Missouri County, case number 18DA-CC00054, All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6171736. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Seitz, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson, et al. v. Green Dot Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Jackson
Represented By: Nathan Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Chapman
Represented By: Nathan Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Dot Corporation
Represented By: Camber Jones
Represented By: Michael W Seitz
Represented By: Jason C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?