USA v. Garrucha-Gallego
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Noel Garrucha-Gallego
Case Number: 6:2019cv03061
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Referring Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:4246
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE (SEALED) by Noel Garrucha-Gallego (Mercer, David)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Sealed Motion. (Berziel, Karla)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Order (SEALED) filed by David R. Mercer on behalf of Noel Garrucha-Gallego. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Mercer, David)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - Motion for separate exam, if any, due 3/18/2019. Signed on 2/15/2019 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (DO) Modified on 2/15/2019 copy of NEF mailed to dft Garrucha-Gallego (Siegert, Karen).
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David P. Rush and appointing the Federal Public Defender's Office to represent the defendant. Signed on 2/14/19 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Siegert, Karen) Modified on 2/15/2019 copy of order mailed to dft Garrucha-Gallego (Siegert, Karen).
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR MENTAL STATUS (SEALED) Petition to Determine Present Mental Condition of an Imprisoned Person filed by Shane Patrick McCullough on behalf of USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McCullough, Shane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Garrucha-Gallego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noel Garrucha-Gallego
Represented By: David R. Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Shane Patrick McCullough
Represented By: Cynthia J. Hyde
Represented By: Christina L. Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?