Wild v. Glass et al

Plaintiff: Alexander L. Wild
Defendant: Kip Glass and Autumn Olive Farms, LLC d/b/a Beekeeping Bliss
Case Number: 6:2019cv03087
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Referring Judge: John T Maughmer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 Pro Se RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #8 by separate defendant, Kip Glass.NEF mailed to Kip Glass at 2169 N. Farm Rd. 71, Bois D'Arc, MO 65612. (Furtak, Rebecca) Modified on 4/24/2019 linking document (Siegert, Karen).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendants shall file a response to this Order on or before 4/30/2019. Copy of Order mailed to each Defendant at addresses shown on the Summons Return of Service (Docs. 5 and 6). Signed on 4/17/19 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer to District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. Please note the new case number: 19-3087-CV-S-MDH. (Melvin, Greg)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Alexander L. Wild. Autumn Olive Farms, LLC d/b/a Beekeeping Bliss served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019. (Ross, Nathan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Alexander L. Wild. Kip Glass served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019. (Ross, Nathan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Nathan Ross on behalf of Alexander L. Wild (Attorney Nathan Ross added to party Alexander L. Wild(pty:pla))(Ross, Nathan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 ***Remark- Report on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. A copy has been mailed to the Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave, S.E., Washington, D.C., 20559-6000. (Furtak, Rebecca) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/6/2019) (Furtak, Rebecca).
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
March 1, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 3/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. Emailed to Plaintiff's Counsel. (Furtak, Rebecca)
March 1, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Autumn Olive Farms, LLC d/b/a Beekeeping Bliss, Kip Glass filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Alexander L. Wild. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6199221. Service due by 5/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wild v. Glass et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kip Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autumn Olive Farms, LLC d/b/a Beekeeping Bliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander L. Wild
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?