USA v. Ramgeet
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Damion Ramgeet
Case Number: 6:2019cv03164
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Referring Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:4246
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 PSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION (Sealed). (Berziel, Karla)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE (SEALED) by Damion Ramgeet (Mercer, David)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Sealed Motion. Signed on 06/04/19 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. (Moss, Christa)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Order (SEALED) filed by David R. Mercer on behalf of Damion Ramgeet. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Mercer, David)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (SEALED) - Motion for additional psychological examination, if any, due 6/13/2019. Signed on 05/13/19 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moss, Christa) Modified on 5/14/2019 copy of NEF mailed to defendant Ramgeet (Siegert, Karen).
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to United States Magistrate Judge David P. Rush, and appointing the Federal Public Defender's Office to represent defendant. Signed on 5/13/2019 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Keller, Jeanne)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR MENTAL STATUS (SEALED) Petition to Determine Present Mental Condition of an Imprisoned Person filed by Christina L. Scofield on behalf of USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Scofield, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Ramgeet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damion Ramgeet
Represented By: David R. Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Shane Patrick McCullough
Represented By: Cynthia J. Hyde
Represented By: Christina L. Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?