Ivey Roofing, Inc. v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: The United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Ivey Roofing, Inc. and Ivey Roofing, Inc.
Defendant: Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC and Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv03214
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE filed by Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Melvin, Greg)
July 17, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Siegert, Karen)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by G. Steven Ruprecht on behalf of Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC (Attorney G. Steven Ruprecht added to party Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC(pty:dft))(Ruprecht, G.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Separate Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer,, Complaint, on behalf of Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC.(Attorney Kurt S. Brack added to party Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC(pty:dft))(Brack, Kurt)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Ivey Roofing, Inc. against Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC, Hartford Fire Insurance Company filed by S. Owen Griffin on behalf of Ivey Roofing, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 6352867. ( Service due by 9/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Griffin, S. Owen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivey Roofing, Inc. v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC
Represented By: Kurt S. Brack
Represented By: G. Steven Ruprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Ivey Roofing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivey Roofing, Inc.
Represented By: S. Owen Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?