New Prime, Inc. v. Amazon Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: New Prime, Inc.
Defendant: Amazon Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv03236
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, on behalf of Amazon Technologies, Inc..(Zeeck, Phillip)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 & #13 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Nathan Shafroth and Lindsey Barnhart for Amazon Technologies, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to allow Lindsey Barnhart to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6453564) filed by Phillip James Richard Zeeck on behalf of Amazon Technologies, Inc.. (Zeeck, Phillip)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to allow Nathan E. Shafroth to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6453544) filed by Phillip James Richard Zeeck on behalf of All Defendants. (Zeeck, Phillip)
July 24, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/8/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 9/23/2019. Signed on 7/23/19 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Amazon Technologies, Inc. has up to and including August 23, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. No further extensions of time to respond shall be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (KR)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Phillip James Richard Zeeck on behalf of Amazon Technologies, Inc. (Attorney Phillip James Richard Zeeck added to party Amazon Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Zeeck, Phillip)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Russell S. Jones, Jr on behalf of Amazon Technologies, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/2/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Jones, Russell)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Russell S. Jones, Jr on behalf of Amazon Technologies, Inc. (Attorney Russell S. Jones, Jr added to party Amazon Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jones, Russell)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by New Prime, Inc.. Amazon Technologies, Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (McCallon, Travis)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Luke Meriwether on behalf of New Prime, Inc. (Attorney Luke Meriwether added to party New Prime, Inc.(pty:pla))(Meriwether, Luke)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Eric Donald Sidler on behalf of New Prime, Inc. (Attorney Eric Donald Sidler added to party New Prime, Inc.(pty:pla))(Sidler, Eric)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Travis W. McCallon on behalf of Plaintiff New Prime, Inc..(McCallon, Travis)
July 3, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon Technologies, Inc., and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon Technologies, Inc. filed by Travis W. McCallon on behalf of New Prime, Inc.. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6384596. Service due by 9/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A.1 - Prime use (Part 1), #3 Exhibit A.2 - Prime use (Part 2), #4 Exhibit A.3 - Prime use (Part 3), #5 Exhibit B - 3/31/12 Office Action, #6 Exhibit C - 10/29/12 Office Action, #7 Exhibit D - 5/23/13 Office Action, #8 Exhibit E.1 - 10/31/17 Office Action (Part 1), #9 Exhibit E.2 - 10/31/17 Office Action (Part 2), #10 Exhibit E.3 - 10/31/17 Office Action (Part 3), #11 Exhibit E.4 - 10/31/17 Office Action (Part 4), #12 Exhibit F - 5-22-18 Suspension, #13 Exhibit G - 78559146 Application, #14 Exhibit H - 8-31-05 Office Action, #15 Exhibit I - 11-05 Examiner's Amendment, #16 Exhibit J - Notice of Allowance, #17 Exhibit K - Statement of Use, #18 Exhibit L - 3234643 Registration, #19 Exhibit M - Dec of Use, Incontestability, #20 Exhibit N - Declaration of Use, #21 Exhibit O - 87033547 Application, #22 Exhibit P - 87033480 Application, #23 Exhibit Q - 87177080 Application, #24 Exhibit R - 87394793 Application, #25 Exhibit S - 87394812 Application, #26 Exhibit T - 87394793 6-1 Office Action, #27 Exhibit U - 87394812 6-1 Office Action, #28 Exhibit V - 87394793 Rsp to Office Action, #29 Exhibit W - 87394812 Rsp to Office Action, #30 Exhibit X - Amazon Use, #31 Exhibit Y - 87177080 Office Action)(McCallon, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Prime, Inc. v. Amazon Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Russell S. Jones, Jr.
Represented By: Lindsey Catherine Barnhart
Represented By: Phillip James Richard Zeeck
Represented By: Nathan Shafroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Prime, Inc.
Represented By: Travis W. McCallon
Represented By: Luke Meriwether
Represented By: Eric Donald Sidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?