K.M. v. AETNA Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: K.M.
Defendant: AETNA Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv03292
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: John T Maughmer
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed on 10/9/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
October 9, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of AETNA Life Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mack, Cristin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Sealed filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of Defendant AETNA Life Insurance Company. (Mack, Cristin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 Before the Court is Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Answer Under Seal to Protect Confidential Health Information. (Doc. #17). For good cause stated the Motion is granted. Defendant is granted leave to file under seal Defendant's Answer. Signed on 10/3/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to file Answer Under Seal filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of AETNA Life Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Mack, Cristin)
September 11, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/28/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2019 10:30 AM in BK Courtroom - Springfield before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 9/5/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 Before this Court is Defendant's Second Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Petition. (Doc. #13). For good cause stated the Motion is granted. Defendant is granted an extension of time until and including October 3, 2019, to file a response to Plaintiff's Petition. Signed on 9/5/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable Brian C. Wimes, this case was randomly reassigned to the Honorable Stephen R. Bough for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 6:19-3292-CV-S-SRB. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Burch, Steve)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION - The Case Management Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/16/19 at 9:30 a.m. before District Judge Brian C. Wimes has been cancelled due to case reassignment. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Petition filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of AETNA Life Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Mack, Cristin)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/4/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 9/20/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 9/4/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer to District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Please note the new case number: 19-3292-CV-S-BCW. (Melvin, Greg)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Eric P. Mathisen for AETNA Life Insurance Company allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 motion to amend caption and redact plaintiff name in filings with the Court to protect confidential health information; granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer AETNA Life Insurance Company answer due 9/12/2019. Signed on 8/22/19 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Alexander, Pam)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to allow Eric P. Mathisen to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number 4485590003050180) filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of AETNA Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bar Admissions)(Mack, Cristin)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to file answer Unopposed filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of AETNA Life Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Mack, Cristin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/20/2019 and NEF regenerated) (Siegert, Karen).
August 15, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to counsel for the parties. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 9/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Siegert, Karen)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 8/15/19 as Document No. 4, Entry of Appearance. The document has been deleted because the attorney has not been admitted to the Western District of Missouri. Attorney's office has been contacted by telephone and advised that counsel should either be admitted to the Western District of Missouri or file a Petition to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Siegert, Karen)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for order to Amend Caption and Redact Plaintiffs Name From Filings to Protect Confidential Health Information filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of AETNA Life Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Mack, Cristin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Eric P. Mathisen on behalf of AETNA Life Insurance Company (Attorney Eric P. Mathisen added to party AETNA Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Mathisen, Eric)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of Defendant AETNA Life Insurance Company.(Mack, Cristin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing to Parties of Notice of Removal by AETNA Life Insurance Company (Mack, Cristin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Greene County, MO County, case number 1931-cc00849, filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of AETNA Life Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6447492. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. State Court File)(Mack, Cristin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/15/2019 with a un-editable pdf document) (Siegert, Karen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.M. v. AETNA Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.M.
Represented By: Jason W. MacPherson
Represented By: Cynthia O. MacPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Cristin J Mack
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?