Andrzejewski v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Andrzejewski
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv03339
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company.(Davidson, Steven)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company.(Davidson, Steven)
October 16, 2019 Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/20/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 12/5/2019. Signed on 10/11/19 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company answer or response due 11/5/2019. Signed on 10/11/2019 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levin, Benjamin)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) filed by Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Steven D. Davidson added to party Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Davidson, Steven)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Anthony J. Andrzejewski. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Hall, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
September 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. Summons returned via electronic mail to counsel for Plaintiff for service. (Burch, Steve)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company filed by David W. Hall, Jr on behalf of Anthony J. Andrzejewski. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6501082. Service due by 12/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hall, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrzejewski v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Andrzejewski
Represented By: David W. Hall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?