Woods v. New Covenant Academy
Plaintiff: Zacqrey Woods
Defendant: New Covenant Academy
Case Number: 6:2019cv03353
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zacqrey Woods for Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions to Defendant filed by Robert A Bruce on behalf of Plaintiff Zacqrey Woods.(Bruce, Robert)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Rick E. Temple on behalf of Defendant New Covenant Academy.(Temple, Rick)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Robert A Bruce on behalf of Plaintiff Zacqrey Woods.(Bruce, Robert)
November 20, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ron Mitchell(Bruce, Robert)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Report of Rule 26(f) Conference by Zacqrey Woods. (Bruce, Robert)
October 16, 2019 Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Rick E. Temple on behalf of Defendant New Covenant Academy.(Temple, Rick)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of New Covenant Academy.(Temple, Rick)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/3/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 10/10/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greene County, Missouri Circuit Court County, case number 1931-CC00198, filed by Rick E. Temple on behalf of New Covenant Academy. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6517835. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition First Amended Petition for Damages, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Temple, Rick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. New Covenant Academy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Covenant Academy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zacqrey Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?