Carano-King et al v. Bogenschuetz et al
Plaintiff: Gary King and Angelita Carano-King
Defendant: SCA, Inc. and David J. Bogenschuetz
Case Number: 6:2019cv03361
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion for extension of timeProposed scheduling order due by 12/12/2019. Signed on 12/2/19 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (View, Pat)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for extension of time to File Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Nicholas W Smart on behalf of Angelita Carano-King, Gary King. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Smart, Nicholas)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Nicholas W Smart on behalf of Angelita Carano-King, Gary King (Attorney Nicholas W Smart added to party Angelita Carano-King(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas W Smart added to party Gary King(pty:pla))(Smart, Nicholas)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Steve Garner on behalf of Angelita Carano-King, Gary King (Attorney Steve Garner added to party Angelita Carano-King(pty:pla), Attorney Steve Garner added to party Gary King(pty:pla))(Garner, Steve)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/2/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 11/8/2019. Signed on 10/9/19 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of David J. Bogenschuetz, SCA, Inc..(Brooker, Matthew)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Matthew J. Brooker on behalf of Defendants David J. Bogenschuetz, SCA, Inc..(Brooker, Matthew)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Matthew J. Brooker on behalf of All Defendants (Brooker, Matthew)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Michael D. Matteuzzi on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Michael D. Matteuzzi added to party David J. Bogenschuetz(pty:dft), Attorney Michael D. Matteuzzi added to party SCA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Matteuzzi, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Greene County, Missouri County, case number 1931-CC01013, filed by Matthew J. Brooker on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6530627. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Brooker, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Keller, Jeanne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carano-King et al v. Bogenschuetz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary King
Represented By: Matthew W Corbett
Represented By: Nicholas W Smart
Represented By: Steve Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelita Carano-King
Represented By: Matthew W Corbett
Represented By: Nicholas W Smart
Represented By: Steve Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCA, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Matteuzzi
Represented By: Matthew J. Brooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Bogenschuetz
Represented By: Michael D. Matteuzzi
Represented By: Matthew J. Brooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?