Ava R-1 School District v. Juul Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ava R-1 School District
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inic. and Juul Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv03391
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-10, from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to the Northern District of California to be included in MDL No. 2913. Signed on 11/15/2019. Case electronically transferred. (Burch, Steve)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Signed on 11/6/2019 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. (DO)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #1 Complaint, UNOPPOSED filed by James F. Bennett on behalf of Defendant Juul Labs, Inic.. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Bennett, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #1 Complaint, UNOPPOSED filed by James F. Bennett on behalf of Juul Labs, Inic.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bennett, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by James F. Bennett on behalf of Juul Labs, Inic. (Attorney James F. Bennett added to party Juul Labs, Inic.(pty:dft))(Bennett, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Ava R-1 School District. Juul Labs, Inic. served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Cartmell, Thomas)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 MDL Notification - Notice of potential tag along case for MDL 2913 with copy of complaint and docket sheet sent to MDL Panel. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Keller, Jeanne)
November 1, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 11/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)
November 1, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Juul Labs, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Juul Labs, Inic. filed by Thomas P. Cartmell on behalf of Ava R-1 School District. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6564911. Service due by 1/29/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cartmell, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ava R-1 School District v. Juul Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inic.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ava R-1 School District
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?