Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company v. Stoner-Thompson et al
Plaintiff: Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Elizabeth Stoner-Thompson, a minor J.S., Alyssa Strong and J.S.
Case Number: 6:2019cv03402
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service unexecuted by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company as to J.S.. (Meadows, James)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service unexecuted by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company as to Elizabeth Stoner-Thompson. (Meadows, James)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service sent to Elizabeth Stoner-Thompson and J.S., a minor on January 6, 2020 by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 2/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Interpleader Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Waiver of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Duty to Avoid Unnecessary Expenses Serving a Summons)(Meadows, James)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time to file response. Defendant Alyssa Strong has until 1/24/20 to file a responsive pleading. Signed on 12/23/19 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #1 Complaint, filed by Derek Adam Ankrom on behalf of Alyssa Strong. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Derek Adam Ankrom added to party Alyssa Strong(pty:dft))(Ankrom, Derek)
December 18, 2019 SUMMONS REISSUED as to J.S., and Elizabeth Stoner-Thompson, and e-mailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company. Alyssa Strong served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Meadows, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service unexecuted by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company as to J.S.. (Meadows, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service unexecuted by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company as to Elizabeth Stoner-Thompson. (Meadows, James) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/13/2019 at the request of filer and NEF regenerated) (Siegert, Karen).
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Joseph Taylor White on behalf of Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company (Attorney Joseph Taylor White added to party Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company(pty:pla))(White, Joseph)
November 19, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to J.S. Summons returned via electronic mail to counsel for Plaintiff for service. (Burch, Steve)
November 19, 2019 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to Elizabeth Stoner-Thompson and Alyssa Strong. Summonses returned via electronic mail to counsel for Plaintiff for service. (Burch, Steve)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader and Declaratory Judgment against J.S., Elizabeth Stoner-Thompson, Alyssa Strong filed by James Edwin Meadows on behalf of Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6589054. Service due by 2/18/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Meadows, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Siegert, Karen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company v. Stoner-Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Stoner-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: a minor J.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyssa Strong
Represented By: Derek Adam Ankrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company
Represented By: James Edwin Meadows
Represented By: Joseph Taylor White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?