Afiz v. S.C.C.C. Prison Officials et al
Plaintiff: Abdul Hakeem Afiz and Miron Taylor
Defendant: Mr. Unknown Wade, Mr. Billy Herndon, Unknown S.C.C.C. Prison Officials and Mr. Unknown Thessan
Case Number: 6:2019cv03410
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: This case is DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (Willis, Kathy)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). If Plaintiff wishes to reassert his claims, he first must pay the filing and administrative fees totaling $400. Signed on 12/18/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Willis, Kathy)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-02720.
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 SEALED Letter from Clerk to Abdul Hakeem Afiz. (BRP) [Transferred from moed on 12/4/2019.]
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Tue Nov 5 10:20:43 CST 2019 (Tillman, Tiffani) [Transferred from moed on 12/4/2019.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT to: United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri. Case to be transferred after 12/4/2019. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/4/2019. (TMT) [Transferred from moed on 12/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) [Transferred from moed on 12/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Oct 8 11:00:56 CDT 2019 (admin,) [Transferred from moed on 12/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 12/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 12/4/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 Document construed as, "PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983" against defendant Billy Herndon, Unknown S.C.C.C. Prison Officials, Unknown Thessan, Unknown Wade, filed by Abdul Hakeem Afiz. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope, #3 Judge Assignment Label)(DLB) [Transferred from moed on 12/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Afiz v. S.C.C.C. Prison Officials et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul Hakeem Afiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miron Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Unknown Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Billy Herndon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown S.C.C.C. Prison Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Unknown Thessan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?