Hillsman v. Springfield R-12 School District
Plaintiff: Charity Hillsman
Defendant: Springfield R-12 School District
Case Number: 6:2019cv03421
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1415
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Dismissal With Prejudice., Motions terminated: #4 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Charity Hillsman. Signed on 1/23/20 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Benjamin R Brockert on behalf of Charity Hillsman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Brockert, Benjamin)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Ransom A. Ellis, III on behalf of Springfield R-12 School District (Attorney Ransom A. Ellis, III added to party Springfield R-12 School District(pty:dft))(Ellis, Ransom)
December 27, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Springfield R-12 School District, and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Springfield R-12 School District filed by Benjamin R Brockert on behalf of Charity Hillsman. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6622888. Service due by 3/9/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Brockert, Benjamin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Keller, Jeanne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillsman v. Springfield R-12 School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springfield R-12 School District
Represented By: Ransom A. Ellis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charity Hillsman
Represented By: Benjamin R Brockert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?