O'Neal v. Missouri Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Anthony O'Neal
Defendant: Missouri Department of Corrections and South Central Correctional Center
Case Number: 6:2019cv03441
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 RECEIPT number KCMO082585 in the amount of $76.19 issued to Anthony O'Neal. (Crocker, Susan)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Court construes Plaintiff's Response (Doc. #10 ) as a motion for an extension of time to pay his initial partial filing fee. That motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's initial partial filing fee is now due on or before February 10, 2020. Plaintiff's failure to make the payment will result in dismissal without further notice. Signed on 01/31/2020 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Willis, Kathy)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause (Doc. 9 ) filed by Anthony O'Neal.(Willis, Kathy)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: ORDERED that, because Plaintiff has not paid the initial partial filing fee as previously ordered, Plaintiff shall show cause, on or before February 12, 2020 as to why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Signed on January 29, 2020 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. #6 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed on 01/17/2020 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Willis, Kathy)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by Anthony O'Neal as directed by Order dated 01/13/2020 (Doc. #5 ).(Willis, Kathy)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Anthony O'Neal. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/29/2020. (Willis, Kathy)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis and must pay an initial partial filing fee of $76.19 on or before January 27, 2020; (2) the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a set of court-approved forms; (3) Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint on or before January 27, 2020; (4) Plaintiff's failure to pay his initial partial filing fee and to file an amended complaint on or before January 27, 2020, will result in dismissal without prejudice without further notice. Signed on 01/13/2020 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this Order and a set of court-approved forms were mailed to Plaintiff as directed.)(Willis, Kathy)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Anthony O'Neal. (Davies, Cindy)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Anthony O'Neal. (Davies, Cindy)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Anthony O'Neal. (Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neal v. Missouri Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Central Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?