American Family Insurance Company v. McLaughlin et al
Plaintiff: American Family Insurance Company
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company, Douglas Dale, Gerald McLaughlin, Diana Roe, Michael Jones, Ben Roe, Joseph Roe, Daisy McLaughlin, Geico Indemnity Company, Matt Roe and Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Case Number: 6:2020cv03081
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/23/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 6/8/2020. Signed on 5/6/20 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
May 6, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Ben Roe, Diana Roe, Joseph Roe.(Attorney Jonathan P. Davis added to party Ben Roe(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan P. Davis added to party Diana Roe(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan P. Davis added to party Joseph Roe(pty:dft))(Davis, Jonathan)
April 24, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Daisy McLaughlin, Gerald McLaughlin.(Attorney Kurt J. Larson added to party Daisy McLaughlin(pty:dft), Attorney Kurt J. Larson added to party Daisy McLaughlin(pty:crd), Attorney Kurt J. Larson added to party Gerald McLaughlin(pty:dft), Attorney Kurt J. Larson added to party Gerald McLaughlin(pty:crd))(Larson, Kurt)
April 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of appearance by Steve Garner on behalf of Michael Jones (Attorney Steve Garner added to party Michael Jones(pty:dft))(Garner, Steve)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Company.(Marusic, Irene)
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Geico Indemnity Company.(Marusic, Irene)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Irene J. Marusic on behalf of Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attorney Irene J. Marusic added to party Geico Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Irene J. Marusic added to party Government Employees Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Marusic, Irene)
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Russell F. Watters on behalf of Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attorney Russell F. Watters added to party Geico Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Russell F. Watters added to party Government Employees Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Watters, Russell)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 Micheal Jones' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and, CROSSCLAIM against American Family Insurance Company, Douglas Dale, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, Daisy McLaughlin, Gerald McLaughlin, Ben Roe, Diana Roe, Joseph Roe, Matt Roe on behalf of Michael Jones.(Attorney Neil Chanter added to party Michael Jones(pty:dft))(Chanter, Neil)
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by American Family Insurance Company. Government Employees Insurance Company served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Clifford, Matthew)
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by American Family Insurance Company. Geico Indemnity Company served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Clifford, Matthew)
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by American Family Insurance Company. Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Clifford, Matthew)
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by American Family Insurance Company. Joseph Roe served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Clifford, Matthew)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by American Family Insurance Company. Michael Jones served on 4/2/2020, answer due 4/23/2020. (Clifford, Matthew)
March 19, 2020 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to Douglas Dale, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, Michael Jones, Daisy McLaughlin, Gerald McLaughlin, Ben Roe, Diana Roe, Joseph Roe, and Matt Roe. Summonses returned via electronic mail to counsel for Plaintiff for service. (Burch, Steve)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader against All Defendants filed by Matthew McKain Clifford on behalf of American Family Insurance Company. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6783883. Service due by 6/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clifford, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Insurance Company v. McLaughlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Irene J. Marusic
Represented By: Russell F. Watters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt J. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Roe
Represented By: Jonathan P. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jones
Represented By: Neil Chanter
Represented By: Steve Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Roe
Represented By: Jonathan P. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Roe
Represented By: Jonathan P. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daisy McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt J. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Irene J. Marusic
Represented By: Russell F. Watters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew McKain Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?