Rothrock v. Capitol Logistics, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Lindsey Rothrock, individually, and as Next Friend of Grace Rothrock and Jolee RothRock and Lindsey Rothrock
Defendant: Capital Logistics and Warehousing Group, Inc., Scott Lee Hines, On Track Transport LLC, The Cincinnati Insurance Company and Capitol Logistics, LLC
Intervenor: Allied World Assurance Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv03113
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Remand letter and instructions sent to Circuit Court of Greene County, Missouri. This is a text entry only - no document is attached (Houston, Kiambu) Certified copy of Order No. 24 mailed on 5/27/2020 to Greene County Circuit Clerk, 1010 Boonville Ave, Springfield MO 65802 via certified mail. (Houston, Kiambu) Modified on 5/27/2020: Sent by certified mail, article No. 7006 2760 0000 6393 8571, on 5/27/2020. (Melvin, Greg)
May 26, 2020 Filing 25 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Diefenbach, Tracy)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #12 motion to remand Signed on 5/26/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Houston, Kiambu)
May 22, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #12 MOTION to remand PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND Plaintiffs' Reply Suggestions in Support of Their Motion for Remand filed by Jeff Michael Bauer on behalf of Plaintiff Lindsey Rothrock, individually, and as Next Friend of Grace Rothrock and Jolee RothRock. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Bauer, Jeff)
May 21, 2020 Filing 22 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ron Mitchell(Chanter, Neil)
May 21, 2020 Filing 21 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Lindsey Rothrock, individually, and as Next Friend of Grace Rothrock and Jolee RothRock. (Chanter, Neil)
May 18, 2020 Filing 20 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lindsey Rothrock, individually, and as Next Friend of Grace Rothrock and Jolee RothRock. (Chanter, Neil)
May 15, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Paula Sue Green on behalf of Defendant Capitol Logistics, LLC. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Green, Paula)
May 14, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #4 MOTION to intervene and Memorandum in Support of Allied World Assurance Company filed by Timothy B. Niedbalski on behalf of Intervenor Allied World Assurance Company. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Niedbalski, Timothy)
May 13, 2020 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #12 MOTION to remand PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND filed by Paula Sue Green on behalf of Defendants Capitol Logistics, LLC, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Reply suggestions due by 5/27/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Green, Paula)
May 5, 2020 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kevin P. Clark on behalf of Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Clark, Kevin)
May 1, 2020 Filing 15 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Neil Chanter on behalf of Plaintiff Lindsey Rothrock, individually, and as Next Friend of Grace Rothrock and Jolee RothRock. Reply suggestions due by 5/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #6 ) (Chanter, Neil)
April 30, 2020 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #4 MOTION to intervene and Memorandum in Support of Allied World Assurance Company filed by Neil Chanter on behalf of Plaintiff Lindsey Rothrock, individually, and as Next Friend of Grace Rothrock and Jolee RothRock. Reply suggestions due by 5/14/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Chanter, Neil)
April 29, 2020 Filing 13 SUGGESTIONS in support re #12 MOTION to remand PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND filed by Jeff Michael Bauer on behalf of Plaintiff Lindsey Rothrock, individually, and as Next Friend of Grace Rothrock and Jolee RothRock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #12 ) (Bauer, Jeff)
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to remand PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND filed by Jeff Michael Bauer on behalf of Lindsey Rothrock, individually, and as Next Friend of Grace Rothrock and Jolee RothRock. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Attorney Jeff Michael Bauer added to party Lindsey Rothrock, individually, and as Next Friend of Grace Rothrock and Jolee RothRock(pty:pla))(Bauer, Jeff)
April 29, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/2/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2020 01:45 PM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 4/28/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Timothy B. Niedbalski on behalf of Allied World Assurance Company (Attorney Timothy B. Niedbalski added to party Allied World Assurance Company(pty:intv))(Niedbalski, Timothy)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by G. Keith Phoenix on behalf of Allied World Assurance Company (Attorney G. Keith Phoenix added to party Allied World Assurance Company(pty:intv))(Phoenix, G.)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing Supplemental Memorandum by Capitol Logistics, LLC (Green, Paula)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Paula Sue Green on behalf of Defendant Capitol Logistics, LLC. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Green, Paula)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Paula Sue Green on behalf of Capitol Logistics, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Green, Paula)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to intervene and Memorandum in Support of Allied World Assurance Company filed by Timothy B. Niedbalski on behalf of ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Timothy B. Niedbalski added to party ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY(pty:intv))(Niedbalski, Timothy)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing memorandum in support of removal by Capital Logistics and Warehousing Group, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, (Green, Paula)
April 16, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 4/16/2020 as Document No. 2, NOTICE OF REMOVAL Memorandum in support of removal. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel has been contacted and will refile the document using the correct event. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Memorandum in support of removal filed by Paula Sue Green on behalf of Capital Logistics and Warehousing Group, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6823823.(Green, Paula)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Paula Sue Green on behalf of Capital Logistics and Warehousing Group, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6823823. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rothrock Petition, #2 Exhibit Pet for Appt of Next Friend - Grace, #3 Exhibit Pet for Appt of Next Friend - Jolee, #4 Exhibit Proposed Order Appointing Next Friend - Grace, #5 Exhibit Proposed Order Appointing Next Friend - Jolee, #6 Exhibit Order Appointing Next Friend - Grace, #7 Exhibit Order Appointing Next Friend - Jolee, #8 Exhibit Garner to Judge Cordonnier, #9 Exhibit EOA of Keith Phoenix for AW, #10 Exhibit EOA Tim Niedbalski for AW, #11 Exhibit AW Motion to Intervene, #12 Exhibit EOA of Kevin Clark for CIC, #13 Exhibit CIC Motion to Intervene, #14 Exhibit NOH Wrongful Death Approval, #15 Exhibit App for Approval of Wrongful Death Settlement, #16 Exhibit Judgment Approving Wrongful Death Settlement, #17 Exhibit Judge Cordonnier to all - judgment signed, #18 Exhibit Satisfaction of On Track Settlement, #19 Exhibit Proposed Judgment of Dismissal of Hines and On Trac, #20 Exhibit Dismissal of On Track and Hine, #21 Exhibit Scott Rothrock obituary)(Green, Paula) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2020: #22 Civil Cover Sheet) (Keller, Jeanne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothrock v. Capitol Logistics, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Logistics and Warehousing Group, Inc.
Represented By: Paula Sue Green
Represented By: Gary B. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Lee Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On Track Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin P. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Paula Sue Green
Represented By: Gary B. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Rothrock, individually, and as Next Friend of Grace Rothrock and Jolee RothRock
Represented By: Neil Chanter
Represented By: Jacob A Lewis
Represented By: Steve Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Rothrock
Represented By: Neil Chanter
Represented By: Jacob A Lewis
Represented By: Steve Garner
Represented By: Jeff Michael Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Allied World Assurance Company
Represented By: Timothy B. Niedbalski
Represented By: G. Keith Phoenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?