Bush v. Greene County Justice Center
Plaintiff: Jordan Tyrell Bush
Defendant: Greene County Justice Center
Case Number: 6:2020cv03169
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Jordan Tyrell Bushmarked Inmate No Longer Here/Return to Sender/Unable to Forward (Related documents #6 , #7 ) (Willis, Kathy)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED that this case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Any motion to reopen must be filed within a reasonable time and must be accompanied by Plaintiff's $0.50 initial partial filing fee and amended complaint, as previously ordered. (Davies, Cindy)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: ORDERED that this case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Any motion to reopen must be filed within a reasonable time and must be accompanied by Plaintiff's $0.50 initial partial filing fee and amended complaint, as previously ordered. Signed on July 14, 2020 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Davies, Cindy)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $0.50; (3) the Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff another set of civil rights forms for his use in filing an amended complaint; (4) Plaintiff is directed to file a single superseding amended complaint, as specifically discussed herein; and (5) Plaintiff's failure to both pay the required initial partial filing fee and amend as directed, on or before July 1, 2020 will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on June 10, 2020 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (CLERK'S NOTE: Civil rights forms mailed to plaintiff with copy of order as directed.) (Davies, Cindy)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Jordan Tyrell Bush. (Davies, Cindy)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Jordan Tyrell Bush. (Davies, Cindy)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greene County Justice Center filed by Jordan Tyrell Bush. (Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush v. Greene County Justice Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Tyrell Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Justice Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?