Stevens v. Jennings
Petitioner: Dusty Stevens
Respondent: Richard Jennings
Case Number: 6:2020cv03218
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 PETITIONER'S REPLY to Doc. #5 filed by Dusty Stevens.(Davies, Cindy)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Petitioner's motion (Doc. #7 ) is denied as moot. The Court notes Respondent filed a timely response to his petition on August 11, 2020. Petitioner is reminded that his Reply, as ordered in Doc. 6 , is due on or before October 1, 2020, or this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed on September 14, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 PETITIONER'S MOTION for order filed by Dusty Stevens. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/28/2020. (Davies, Cindy)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Petitioner file a reply, on or before October 1, 2020, to Respondent's Response (Doc. #5 ), or this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed on 9/1/2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Richard Jennings. (Rodriguez, Evan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 PETITIONER'S IFP Affidavit filed by Dusty Stevens. (Willis, Kathy)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that: (1) Petitioner is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and (2) Respondent answer Petitioner's allegations and show cause on or before August 21, 2020, why the relief Petitioner seeks should not be granted. Signed on 07/21/2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Dusty Stevens (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(Willis, Kathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dusty Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?