Williams v. Smith
Petitioner: Darrell Williams
Respondent: Michael Smith
Case Number: 6:2020cv03224
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: This case is dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Dismissal is without prejudice to any action Petitioner may bring under Bivens. (Willis, Kathy)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This case is dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Dismissal is without prejudice to any action Petitioner may bring under Bivens. Signed on 08/06/2020 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Willis, Kathy)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: ORDERED that Petitioner shall inform the Court by July 31, 2020, if he wants to pursue his claim as a Bivens action; otherwise, this case will be dismissed. Signed on July 23, 2020 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Davies, Cindy)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Darrell Williams(Willis, Kathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darrell Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?