Rothrock v. Allied World Assurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Lindsey Rothrock
Defendant: Capitol Logistics LLC and Allied World Assurance Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv03225
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Remand letter and instructions sent to Circuit Court of Greene County, Missouri. This is a text entry only - no document is attached (Furtak, Rebecca)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #10 motion to dismiss case.; granting #11 motion to remand. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Circuit Court of Greene County, Missouri, as required by 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Signed on 09/15/2020 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Maerz, Mary)
September 10, 2020 Filing 20 RULES OF TRIAL Signed on 9/10/20 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER:( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2022 01:00 PM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Jury Trial set for ten days beginning 2/28/2022 09:00 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2021., Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2022 08:30 AM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool.), ( Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 3/31/2021., Discovery Motions due by 9/10/2021., Status Reports due by 12/9/2020; 3/9/2021; 6/7/2021 and 9/10/2021.) Discovery due by 9/3/2021. Signed on 9/10/20 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
September 9, 2020 Filing 18 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Lindsey Rothrock. (Chanter, Neil)
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #11 MOTION to remand PLAINTIFFS' REPLY SUGGESTIONS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR REMAND filed by Jeff Michael Bauer on behalf of Plaintiff Lindsey Rothrock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Bauer, Jeff)
August 28, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #10 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Timothy B. Niedbalski on behalf of Defendant Allied World Assurance Company. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Niedbalski, Timothy)
August 28, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 8/27/20 as Document No. 15, reply in support motion to dismiss. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document (Response to Motion). Counsel will refile the document using the correct event (Reply Suggestions to Motion). This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Siegert, Karen)
August 27, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to motion re #10 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Timothy B. Niedbalski on behalf of Defendant Allied World Assurance Company. Reply suggestions due by 9/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Niedbalski, Timothy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #11 MOTION to remand filed by Timothy B. Niedbalski on behalf of Defendant Allied World Assurance Company. Reply suggestions due by 9/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Niedbalski, Timothy)
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #10 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Neil Chanter on behalf of Plaintiff Lindsey Rothrock. Reply suggestions due by 8/27/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Chanter, Neil)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 SUGGESTIONS in support re #11 MOTION to remand filed by Jeff Michael Bauer on behalf of Plaintiff Lindsey Rothrock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Bauer, Jeff)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to remand filed by Jeff Michael Bauer on behalf of Lindsey Rothrock. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/20/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit I)(Attorney Jeff Michael Bauer added to party Lindsey Rothrock(pty:pla))(Bauer, Jeff)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Timothy B. Niedbalski on behalf of Allied World Assurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/14/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Niedbalski, Timothy)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Steve Garner on behalf of Lindsey Rothrock (Attorney Steve Garner added to party Lindsey Rothrock(pty:pla))(Garner, Steve)
July 29, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/10/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 8/26/2020. Signed on 7/27/20 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Timothy B. Niedbalski on behalf of Defendant Allied World Assurance Company.(Niedbalski, Timothy)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Allied World Assurance Company. (Niedbalski, Timothy)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Meghan E. Lewis on behalf of Allied World Assurance Company (Attorney Meghan E. Lewis added to party Allied World Assurance Company(pty:dft))(Lewis, Meghan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by G. Keith Phoenix on behalf of Allied World Assurance Company (Attorney G. Keith Phoenix added to party Allied World Assurance Company(pty:dft))(Phoenix, G.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Timothy B. Niedbalski on behalf of Allied World Assurance Company (Niedbalski, Timothy)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Greene County County, case number 2031-CC00137, filed by Timothy B. Niedbalski on behalf of Allied World Assurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6960091. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - STATE COURT FILE, #2 Exhibit B - CONSENT TO REMOVAL, #3 Exhibit C - NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL, #4 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Niedbalski, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothrock v. Allied World Assurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Logistics LLC
Represented By: Paula Sue Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company
Represented By: G. Keith Phoenix
Represented By: Timothy B. Niedbalski
Represented By: Meghan E. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Rothrock
Represented By: Neil Chanter
Represented By: Jeff Michael Bauer
Represented By: Steve Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?