Hambelton v. R&R Express Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Victor Hambelton and Kasey Hambelton
Defendant: Ozark Logistic Corporation, R&R Express Logistics, Inc. and David A. Keeler
Case Number: 6:2020cv03250
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 19 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jacob A Lewis on behalf of Plaintiffs Kasey Hambelton, William Victor Hambelton. Reply suggestions due by 10/14/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Lewis, Jacob)
September 28, 2020 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #12 MOTION to remand and Suggestions in Support filed by Melissa Ann Vaughn on behalf of Defendant R&R Express Logistics, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 10/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Vaughn, Melissa)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORAL ORDER granting Doc. #13 Defendant R&R Express Logistics, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct a Rule 26(F) Conference, Serve Initial Disclosures, and File a Proposed Scheduling Order. A new Rule 26(f) conference deadline and proposed scheduling order deadline will be set, if needed, once a ruling on the pending motion to dismiss (Doc. #7 ) and pending motion to remand (Doc. #12 ) has been filed. Signed on September 18, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORAL ORDER granting #15 Motion to File Response Out of Time to Defendant R&R Express Logistics, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' response shall be filed on ECF forthwith and shall be deemed timely filed. Defendant R&R Express Logistics, Inc.'s reply brief shall be filed within 14 days of the response being filed. Signed on September 18, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for extension of time filed by Jacob A Lewis on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Response to Defendant R&R Express Logistic, Inc's Motion to Dismiss)(Lewis, Jacob)
September 18, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 9/17/2020 as Document No. 14, MOTION for extension of time. Per the request of Plaintiff's counsel, the document has been deleted. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Furtak, Rebecca)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for extension of time filed by Jacob A Lewis on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Response to Defendant R&R Express Logistic, Inc's Motion to Dismiss)(Attorney Jacob A Lewis added to party Kasey Hambelton(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Lewis added to party William Victor Hambelton(pty:pla))(Lewis, Jacob)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time to Conduct a Rule 26(f) Conference, Serve Initial Disclosures, and File Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Melissa Ann Vaughn on behalf of R&R Express Logistics, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Vaughn, Melissa)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to remand and Suggestions in Support filed by Nicholas W Smart on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Smart, Nicholas)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Kasey Hambelton, William Victor Hambelton, David A. Keeler, Ozark Logistic Corporation, R&R Express Logistics, Inc. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Magistrate Consent)(Melvin, Greg)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of filing Defendant Ozark Logistic Corporation's Rule 7.1 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Ozark Logistic Corporation (Putnam, James)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Melissa Ann Vaughn on behalf of Defendant R&R Express Logistics, Inc..(Vaughn, Melissa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Melissa Ann Vaughn on behalf of Defendant R&R Express Logistics, Inc.. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Vaughn, Melissa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Melissa Ann Vaughn on behalf of R&R Express Logistics, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Vaughn, Melissa)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due on or before 10/5/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 9/21/2020. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Notice of Pretrial Procedures. Signed on August 19, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing of Notice of Removal to State Court by R&R Express Logistics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vaughn, Melissa)
August 14, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 9/4/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Civil Cover Sheet by R&R Express Logistics, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Vaughn, Melissa)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Melissa Ann Vaughn on behalf of R&R Express Logistics, Inc. (Vaughn, Melissa)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Howell County County, case number 20AL-CC00070, R&R Express Logistics, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BMOWDC-6993763. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Vaughn, Melissa) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/14/2020) (Keller, Jeanne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hambelton v. R&R Express Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Victor Hambelton
Represented By: Jacob A Lewis
Represented By: Steve Garner
Represented By: Nicholas W Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasey Hambelton
Represented By: Jacob A Lewis
Represented By: Steve Garner
Represented By: Nicholas W Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozark Logistic Corporation
Represented By: James S. Putnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&R Express Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Ann Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Keeler
Represented By: James S. Putnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?