Bates v. Saul
Plaintiff: George Bates, Jr.
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 6:2020cv03252
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Plaintiff, George Bates, Jr. and Defendant, Andrew M. Saul. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Berner, Crystal)
August 20, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons e-mailed to Plaintiff's Counsel for service. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of George Bates, Jr. (Filing fee $400 receipt number IFP) filed byKathleen Overton on behalf of George Bates, Jr. Service due by 11/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Overton, Kathleen)
August 17, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Plaintiff's Form due by 9/8/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 08/17/2020 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Geiser, Angel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of George Bates, Jr. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/31/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Attorney Kathleen Overton added to party George Bates, Jr(pty:pla))(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Bates, Jr.
Represented By: Kathleen Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?