Garrett et al v. Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carla Eggman Garrett and Ralph L Garrett
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. and Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv03253
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ronald Mitchell(Jermann, David)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/19/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/19/2021. Status Conference set for 2/17/2021 10:30 AM; Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2021 10:30 AM; and Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2021 10:30 AM. Bench Trial set for 9/27/2021 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on October 14, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER of Defendants by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Sharp, Darren)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 Amended DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by David Alois Jermann on behalf of Defendants Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc..(Jermann, David)
August 26, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Carla Eggman Garrett, Ralph L Garrett on behalf of Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Contract)(Jermann, David)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by David Alois Jermann on behalf of Defendants Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc..(Jermann, David)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 9/19/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/3/2020. Signed on August 20, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Proof of Filing in State Court by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice to State Court and Plaintiffs of Removal to Federal Court)(Jermann, David)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Taney County, Missouri County, case number 2046-CC00158, filed by David Alois Jermann on behalf of Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6997392. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Circuit Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 Declaration of James Ward, #4 Exhibit 4 Judgments, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jermann, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett et al v. Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: David Alois Jermann
Represented By: Darren K. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: David Alois Jermann
Represented By: Darren K. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Eggman Garrett
Represented By: James R. Howell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph L Garrett
Represented By: James R. Howell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?