Nicholson v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Stephanee Nicholson
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 6:2020cv03257
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Telephone Conference set for 10/20/2020 10:00 AM, before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Parties shall call in by dialing (877) 336-1839 and enter access code 4259420.(Cordell, Annette)
September 19, 2020 Filing 33 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Boston Scientific Corporation and Stephanee Nicholson. (Document received 9/19/20 via WDMO EDSS filing system) (James, Carrie)
September 18, 2020 Filing 34 JOINT STATUS REPORT. (Burch, Steve)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. Lynn R. Johnson's Motion for Entry of Appearance as counsel for Plaintiff (Doc #26 ) is GRANTED. The Motion to Withdraw Michelle Tiger as counsel for Plaintiff (Doc #31 ) is GRANTED. Signed on 9/15/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
September 11, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 9/10/2020 as Document No. 31-1, MOTION to withdraw as attorney of Michelle Tiger. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Furtak, Rebecca)
September 10, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to withdraw as attorney of Michelle Tiger filed by Lee B. Balefsky on behalf of Stephanee Nicholson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/24/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Balefsky, Lee)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Lee B. Balefsky for Stephanee Nicholson allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Christopher A. Gomez for Stephanee Nicholson allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
September 10, 2020 Filing 28 Motion to allow Lee B. Balefsky to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7038586) filed by Lynn R. Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Johnson, Lynn)
September 10, 2020 Filing 27 Motion to allow Christopher A. Gomez to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7038550) filed by Lynn R. Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Johnson, Lynn)
September 10, 2020 Filing 26 First MOTION for leave to appear ENTRY OF APPEARANCE LYNN R. JOHNSON filed by Lynn R. Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/24/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Lynn R. Johnson added to party Stephanee Nicholson(pty:pla))(Johnson, Lynn)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 The Motion to Withdraw attorneys James Keale, Michael Tanenbaum, and Michael Bonasso upon the entry of appearance of Angela M. Hughes is GRANTED. Signed on 9/3/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
September 2, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to withdraw as attorney James Keale, Michael Tanenbaum, and Michael Bonasso filed by Angela M. Hughes on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hughes, Angela)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Angela M. Hughes for Boston Scientific Corporation allowed to appear pro hac vice.This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
September 2, 2020 Filing 22 Motion to allow Angela M. Hughes to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7025286) filed by Angela M. Hughes on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attorney Angela M. Hughes added to party Boston Scientific Corporation(pty:dft))(Hughes, Angela)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. Lead trial counsel for the parties shall confer and, on or before September 18, 2020, file a Joint Statement addressing items listed in this Order. Signed on 8/21/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
August 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of appearance by Paul Del Aguila on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Attorney Paul Del Aguila added to party Boston Scientific Corporation(pty:dft))(Del Aguila, Paul)
August 20, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
August 20, 2020 ***Remark. Due to a case opening location data entry error, this case was reassigned to the Southern Division. Please note the new case number: 6:20-3257-CV-S-BP. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Burch, Steve)
August 19, 2020 Filing 18 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-26351.
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 161 - BSC PTO-11 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit ECF 184 - BSC PTO-13 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info, #3 Exhibit ECF 196 - BSC PTO-14 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF 4955 - BSC PTO-175 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, #7 Exhibit ECF 4987 - BSC PTO-176 (Notice of Correction of Error in PTO-175 - Wave 4 Cases), #8 Exhibit ECF 6100 - BSC PTO-187 - Amended Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, #9 Exhibit ECF 6984 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Badylak, #10 Exhibit ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Badylak, #11 Exhibit ECF 7067 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Badylak, #12 Exhibit ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #13 Exhibit ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #14 Exhibit ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak, #15 Exhibit ECF 6994 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Green, #16 Exhibit ECF 1010 - WAVE 1 and 2 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Green, #17 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX A, #18 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX B, #19 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX C, #20 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX D, #21 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX E, #22 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX F, #23 Exhibit ECF 1018 - BSC PTO-119 - Order re Pending Daubert Motions Filed in MDL, #24 Exhibit ECF 7055 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Lonny Green, MD, #25 Exhibit ECF 7159 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply in Wave 4 Cases for Dr. Lonny Green, #26 Exhibit ECF 6995 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Little, #27 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Little, #28 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 1, #29 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 2, #30 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 3, #31 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 4, #32 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 5, #33 Exhibit ECF 7066 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Little, #34 Exhibit ECF 4979 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Little, #35 Exhibit ECF 5034 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Little, #36 Exhibit ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Little, #37 Exhibit ECF 6986 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Rosenblatt, #38 Exhibit ECF 4833 - Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt and Memo in Support, #39 Exhibit ECF 7061 -BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Rosenblatt, #40 Exhibit ECF 4978 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt, #41 Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh A, #42 Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh B, #43 Exhibit ECF 5039 - Pltf_s Reply Brief in Support of MTE Rosenblatt, #44 Exhibit ECF 6047 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Dr. P. Rosenblatt, #45 Exhibit ECF 7004 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo re Spiegelberg, #46 Exhibit ECF 4827 - Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg and Memo in Support, #47 Exhibit ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #48 Exhibit ECF 4969 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #49 Exhibit ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #50 Exhibit ECF 5031 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #51 Exhibit ECF 6049 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Spiegelberg, #52 Exhibit ECF 7009 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Guelcher, #53 Exhibit ECF 7057 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Guelcher, #54 Exhibit ECF 7166 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of BSC's Prior Reply MTE Guelcher, #55 Exhibit ECF 7015 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Dr. V. Iakovlev, #56 Exhibit ECF 4819 - BSC_s MTE Iakovlev, #57 Exhibit ECF 7050 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Daubert Response re Iakovlev, #58 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Pltf_s Response to BSC_s MTE Iakovlev, #59 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh A1, #60 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh A2, #61 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh B, #62 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh D, #63 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh E, #64 Exhibit ECF 6033 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Iakovlev, #65 Exhibit ECF 7018 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Pence, #66 Exhibit ECF 4815 - BSC_s MTE Pence and Memo in Support, #67 Exhibit ECF 7047 - Pltfs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Pence, #68 Exhibit ECF 4968 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Pence, #69 Exhibit ECF 6038 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Pence, #70 Exhibit ECF 7011 - BSC's MTE General Causation Testimony of Dr. B. Rosenzweig, #71 Exhibit ECF 7085 - Pltf's Response to BSC's MTE General Causation Testimony of Rosenzweig, #72 Exhibit ECF 7175 - BSC's Reply ISO MTE General Causation Testimony of Rosenzweig, #73 Exhibit ECF 6039 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Rosenzweig, #74 Exhibit ECF 52 - BSC_s Memo MTE Guelcher, #75 Exhibit ECF 74 - Ptfs Opp to Dft_s MTE Guelcher, #76 Exhibit ECF 88 - BSC_s Reply MTE Guelcher, #77 Exhibit ECF 100 - Memo, Opinion, and Order (Daubert Motions), #78 Exhibit ECF 67 - ALLEN - BSC_s Memo in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Green, #79 Exhibit ECF 92 - FOWLER - Pltfs Reply in Support of MTE Green, #80 Exhibit ECF 92 - FOWLER - Exhs A-D, #81 Exhibit ECF 115 - Fowler - Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions), #82 Exhibit ECF 216 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #83 Exhibit ECF 275 - BSC_s Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #84 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh A, #85 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh B, #86 Exhibit ECF 473 - Amended Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions))(Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 8/19/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 8/18/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/5/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.] (Furtak, Rebecca).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #12 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Dismiss With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/17/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (maw) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.] (Furtak, Rebecca).
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Testimony Disclosures. (Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.] (Furtak, Rebecca).
August 21, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Stephanee Nicholson in opposition to #12 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.] (Furtak, Rebecca).
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (ts) (ADI)[Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.] (Furtak, Rebecca).
June 13, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Stephanee Nicholson on June 19, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.] (Furtak, Rebecca).
June 7, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephanee Nicholson for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Gomez, Christopher) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.] (Furtak, Rebecca).
March 1, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael A. Tanenbaum on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.] (Furtak, Rebecca).
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mmw) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.] (Furtak, Rebecca).
June 2, 2017 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Stephanee Nicholson. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.] (Furtak, Rebecca).
October 30, 2014 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman on 10/16/2014. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 10/15/2014, answer due 12/15/2014. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.] (Furtak, Rebecca).
October 30, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.] (Furtak, Rebecca).
October 9, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.] (Furtak, Rebecca).
October 1, 2014 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 114 (Motion of Boston Scientific Corporation to Quash and For Entry of a Protective Order Related to Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions) entered on 09/29/2014 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (kw)[Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.] (Furtak, Rebecca).
September 30, 2014 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3465364. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kw) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholson v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanee Nicholson
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky
Represented By: Michelle L. Tiger
Represented By: Christopher A. Gomez
Represented By: Lynn R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Represented By: James H. Keale
Represented By: Angela M. Hughes
Represented By: Paul Del Aguila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?