Murray v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Adrian Murray
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv03276
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Springfield Office
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Steven Scott Schulte for Adrian Murray allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
September 28, 2020 Filing 39 Motion to allow Steven S. Schulte to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7067009) filed by Chelsea E Dickerson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Dickerson, Chelsea) (Main Document 39 replaced on 9/28/2020 to reflect corrected parties on motion) (Warren, Melissa).
September 28, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of appearance by Chelsea E Dickerson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Chelsea E Dickerson added to party Adrian Murray(pty:pla))(Dickerson, Chelsea)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney John Voorhees for Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive, and McKesson Corporation allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney John A. Wharton for Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive, and McKesson Corporation allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
September 24, 2020 Filing 35 Motion to allow John Voorhees to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7062252) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara)
September 24, 2020 Filing 34 Motion to allow John A. Wharton to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7062133) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) (Main Document 34 replaced to correct bar numbers on 9/24/2020) (Warren, Melissa).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDERED counsel for Defendants' Motions to Withdraw (Docs. #30, #31, #32) are GRANTED. Consistent with the requirements of L.R. 83.2, Jordan E. Jarreau (Doc. #30), Jessica Junek (Doc. #31), and Melissa Dorman Matthews (Doc. #32) are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants in this cause. Signed on 9/22/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
September 8, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to withdraw as attorney for Jordan E. Jarreau filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara)
September 8, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to withdraw as attorney for Jessica Junek filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara)
September 8, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to withdraw as attorney for Melissa Dorman Matthews filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara)
September 8, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of appearance by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party C R Bard Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft))(Stubbs, Kara)
September 1, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
September 1, 2020 Filing 27 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02622.
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Grants #20 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows:a. Plaintiff Denise Cheeks's case be severed and transferred to the Alexandria Division of the Eastern District of Virginia (3:20-cv-2620 case opened); b. Plaintiff Stephanie McDade's case be severed and transferred to the Atlanta Division of the Northern District of Georgia (3:20-cv-2621 case opened); c. Plaintiff Adrian Murray's case be severed and transferred to the Southern Division of the Western District of Missouri (3:20-cv-2622 case opened); d. Plaintiff Shai Payne's case be severed and transferred to the Eastern Division of the Eastern District of Missouri (3:20-cv-2623 case opened); e. Plaintiff Merline Salmon's case be severed and transferred to the Fort Lauderdale Division of the Southern District of Florida (3:20-cv-2624 case opened); f. Plaintiff Melvin Smith's case be severed and transferred to the Eastern Division of the Northern District of Alabama (3:20-cv-2625 case opened); g. Plaintiff Robin Smith's case be severed and transferred to the Ashland Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (3:20-cv-2626); and h. Plaintiff Sharon Spangler's case be severed and transferred to the Atlanta Division of the Northern District of Georgia (3:20-cv-2627 case opened). Plaintiff Sharon Lynch is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/31/2020) (mjr) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: The Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff Janice Newson's claims against Defendants. The parties shall bear their own costs. Party Janice Newson terminated. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/25/2020) (axm) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 24 Supplemental RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #20 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Matthews, Melissa) Modified title on 8/25/2020 (awc). [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #20 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 22 Appendix in Support filed by Denise Cheeks, Stephanie McDade, Adrian Murray, Janice Newson, Shai Payne, Merline Salmon, Melvin Smith, Robin Smith, Sharon Spangler re #20 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Denise Cheeks, Stephanie McDade, Adrian Murray, Janice Newson, Shai Payne, Merline Salmon, Melvin Smith, Robin Smith, Sharon Spangler re #20 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs, MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Denise Cheeks, Stephanie McDade, Adrian Murray, Janice Newson, Shai Payne, Merline Salmon, Melvin Smith, Robin Smith, Sharon Spangler (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) Modified on 8/26/2020 (ali). [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Denise Cheeks, Sharon Lynch, Stephanie McDade, Adrian Murray, Janice Newson, Shai Payne, Merline Salmon, Melvin Smith, Robin Smith, Sharon Spangler re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 **DISREGARD- incorrect case number.** RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Denise Cheeks, Sharon Lynch, Stephanie McDade, Adrian Murray, Janice Newson, Shai Payne, Merline Salmon, Melvin Smith, Robin Smith, Sharon Spangler re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) Modified on 8/4/2020 (dsr). [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Denise Cheeks, Sharon Lynch, Stephanie McDade, Adrian Murray, Janice Newson, Shai Payne, Merline Salmon, Melvin Smith, Robin Smith, Sharon Spangler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Denise Cheeks, Sharon Lynch, Stephanie McDade, Adrian Murray, Janice Newson, Shai Payne, Merline Salmon, Melvin Smith, Robin Smith, Sharon Spangler (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 12 replaced with the document flattened on 6/18/2020) (pnp). [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Judge Jane J. Boyle no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/15/2020) (svc) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10911897) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 Citation Issued Bard Peripheral, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 Citation Issued C.R. Bard Inc., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 Citation Issued McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 Affidavit of Service McKinnson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 Return of Service - C. R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 Notice of Initial Dismissal Hearing, #17 Exhibit(s) D-11 Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 9/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Murray
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Chelsea E Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: John Voorhees
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: John Voorhees
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive
Represented By: John Voorhees
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: John Voorhees
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?