Simmerman v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tressa Fay Simmerman
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 6:2020cv03411
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons emailed to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (Furtak, Rebecca)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Daniel A. Parmele on behalf of Tressa Fay Simmerman. (Filing fee $402 receipt number IFP) filed byDaniel A. Parmele on behalf of Tressa Fay Simmerman. Service due by 3/23/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Daniel A. Parmele added to party Tressa Fay Simmerman(pty:pla))(Parmele, Daniel)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis.Signed on 12/23/20 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Kern, Kendra)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Tressa Fay Simmerman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/4/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Attorney Kathleen Overton added to party Tressa Fay Simmerman(pty:pla))(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmerman v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tressa Fay Simmerman
Represented By: Kathleen Overton
Represented By: Daniel A. Parmele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?